1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

GUTIERREZ-V-SANDOVAL

Filed

Nov 07, 2018

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CIVIL

BROWN -V- PARKER

Filed

Nov 21, 2018

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CIVIL

DESANTIS -V- VASPOLI

Filed

Aug 10, 2015

Status

GRANTED 09/08/2015

Type

CIVIL

MEYER-V-SIWECKI

Filed

Jul 27, 2018

Status

Dismissed -- Lack of Prosecution 08/21/2018

Type

CIVIL

ESCHETE-V-STEWART

Filed

Aug 16, 2018

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CIVIL

*MF* BABAKITIS-V-BABAKITIS

Filed

Dec 23, 2010

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CIVIL

CREDITORS VS FLAVOR RESTAURANT

Filed

May 14, 2013

Status

Stipulated Judgment Before Trial 11/04/2013

Type

CIVIL

KIBBLE -V- DIAMOND STAFFING

Filed

Feb 11, 2014

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CIVIL

MATTER OF ASHLEY L ALBERTS

Filed

Jun 20, 2018

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CIVIL

MATTER OF DANIEL & ANGELA GUERRA

Filed

Sep 25, 2018

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CIVIL

IN THE MATTER OF KATHY PEREZ

Filed

Sep 27, 2018

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CIVIL

TYRICEA PHILLIPS -N- JEDIDAH RIVERS

Filed

Oct 24, 2018

Status

Dismissed -- Lack of Prosecution 11/21/2018

Type

CIVIL

LUISA PEPILASCOV

Filed

Jul 14, 2010

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CONSERVATORSHIP

mary hartman

Filed

Feb 14, 2011

Status

Subsequent Petition Before Trial (Probate) 03/02/2015

Type

CONSERVATORSHIP

MTR OF KATHRYN ANN BANDHOLTZ

Filed

Sep 11, 2007

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CONSERVATORSHIP

MTR OF JORGE CAMPOS PEREZ

Filed

Mar 03, 2009

Status

Entry of Judgment Before Trial (Probate) 03/22/2018

Type

CONSERVATORSHIP

MTR OF BERTHA MAE MATTHIAS

Filed

Jun 01, 2011

Status

Entry Court Ordered Dismsl Before Trial (Probate) 08/30/2018

Type

CONSERVATORSHIP

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last »