1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

BELTRAN VS SANCHEZ

Filed

May 29, 2013

Status

Dismissed 09/12/2014

Type

MCC

TINGSTROM VS CHADBOURNE

Filed

Aug 27, 2013

Status

Dismissed 05/01/2014

Type

MCC

MIDLAND FUNDING VS DAHL

Filed

Oct 08, 2013

Status

Judgment 07/31/2014

Type

PSC

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS DIMAS MORALES

Filed

Sep 04, 2014

Status

Dismissed 09/02/2015

Type

PSC

JANE DAVIS VS ANASTASIA MIDKIFF

Filed

Oct 06, 2014

Status

Judgment 11/10/2014

Type

PSC

JESSICA LACROIX VS DENISE GALLEGOS

Filed

Oct 07, 2014

Status

Judgment 10/29/2014

Type

PSC

DEVELOPERS SURETY VS PETER D SOLOMON

Filed

Oct 06, 2014

Status

Dismissed 03/07/2016

Type

PSC

MIDLAND FUNDING VS JAMES DURAND

Filed

Oct 09, 2014

Status

Dismissed 03/12/2015

Type

PSC

MIDLAND FUNDING VS LUIS VALENCIA

Filed

Oct 09, 2014

Status

Dismissed 02/13/2015

Type

PSC

INDIO BERMUDA PALMS VS MARTHA OLIVIA NAVA

Filed

Apr 23, 2015

Status

Complete 05/13/2015

Type

PSC

GROUP XIII PROPERTIES LP VS MANUEL DIAZ

Filed

Apr 29, 2015

Status

Complete 05/12/2015

Type

PSC

CHRISTIANA TRUST VS MUNIR

Filed

Dec 23, 2015

Status

Judgment 04/07/2016

Type

PSC

MHC DATE PALM VS MCCULLOCH

Filed

Dec 31, 2015

Status

Judgment 02/11/2016

Type

PSC

YOUSSEF VS MENDEZ

Filed

Feb 05, 2016

Status

Judgment 04/04/2016

Type

PSC

DARP LLC VS MOLINA

Filed

Sep 28, 2016

Status

Judgment 03/08/2017

Type

PSC

WELLS FARGO VS FLINT

Filed

Sep 30, 2016

Status

Judgment 12/06/2017

Type

PSC

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY VS WIGDAHL

Filed

Nov 07, 2016

Status

Judgment 08/01/2017

Type

PSC

MINTZ VS JRNL TWO BUNCH PALMS

Filed

Nov 14, 2016

Status

Dismissed 01/03/2019

Type

PSC

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC VS LIANG

Filed

Jan 09, 2017

Status

Dismissed 07/27/2017

Type

PSC

LAMSON PROPERTIES VS GARCIA

Filed

Apr 07, 2017

Status

Complete 06/16/2017

Type

PSC

WURTZEL VS CHAFE

Filed

Jul 12, 2017

Status

Dismissed 08/16/2017

Type

PSC

DHANDHO RESIDENTIAL VS CORNELIUS

Filed

Apr 16, 2018

Status

Complete 06/05/2018

Type

PSC

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB VS DAVILA

Filed

Jan 06, 2011

Status

Judgment 04/07/2011

Type

RIC

CAPITAL ONE BANK VS LINDA SHULL

Filed

May 10, 2011

Status

Judgment 08/15/2011

Type

RIC

LOPEZ VS CHAPMAN

Filed

May 20, 2011

Status

Dismissed 05/23/2012

Type

RIC

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last »