1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

Costello vs. Costello And Garman, Llc

Filed

Aug 27, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - PETITION - PARTNERSHIP & CORPORATE GOVERNANCE

People Of The State Of California vs. South

Filed

Aug 27, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - MISC COMPLAINTS - OTHER

Rijanto vs. Restaurant Brodard, Inc.

Filed

Aug 27, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - PI/PD/WD - OTHER

Ids Property Casualty Insurance Company vs. Jose Luna Ornelas

Filed

Aug 28, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - UNINSURED MOTORIST

Nabil Charlie Morcos vs. Jms A/C & Heating

Filed

Aug 27, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - PETITIONS - OTHER

American Express Bank, Fsb vs. Anna M Abbott

Filed

Aug 28, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS

Erlinda Hall vs. Gloria Caseda

Filed

Aug 28, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL

Bex Portfolio, Llc vs. Shahran Emani

Filed

Sep 01, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL

Garrett Trapp vs. The Flame Broiler, Inc.

Filed

Sep 01, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - CIVIL RIGHTS

Nguyen - Name Change

Filed

Sep 02, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - PETITIONS - OTHER

Eugene Weidner vs. Philip James Cuthbertson

Filed

Sep 02, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - BUSINESS TORT

United Auto Credit Corporation vs. R & N Auto Sales 'Don'T Walk' Corp.

Filed

Sep 02, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY

Niguel Shores Community Association vs. Whindzor Douglas Hopkins

Filed

Sep 03, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - OTHER REAL PROPERTY

Balboa Capital Corporation vs. Lentz Enterprises, Inc.

Filed

Sep 03, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - CONTRACT - OTHER

Citibank, N.A. vs. Connie Marie Presley

Filed

Sep 03, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS

Discover Bank vs. Lena Maasarani

Filed

Aug 27, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS

Mirsoltani - Name Change

Filed

Aug 28, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - PETITIONS - OTHER

Mark Beaton vs. Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.

Filed

Aug 28, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - WRONGFUL TERMINATION

James R. Glidewell, Dental Ceramics, Inc. vs. Tony Ly

Filed

Aug 27, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - BUSINESS TORT

Andres Rios vs. Siamack Max Yeganeh Ahang

Filed

Aug 28, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - PETITIONS - OTHER

R.J. Noble Co. vs. Ebs General Engineering, Inc.

Filed

Aug 31, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY

Saywitz Realty Services, Inc. vs. Scot Kelly

Filed

Sep 01, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY

Cmre Financial Services, Inc. vs. Jeremy P. Golden

Filed

Sep 01, 2015

Type

CIVIL - LIMITED - RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS

Mark N Artukovich vs. Emin Kayiran

Filed

Sep 02, 2015

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - HARASSMENT

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last »