1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

Estate of Barbara Howell

Filed

Jun 22, 2016

Status

Inactive

Type

Spousal Property Petition

Estate of Robert E Rota

Filed

Aug 01, 2016

Status

Inactive

Type

Decedent's Estate

XXXXX

Filed

Oct 20, 2016

Status

Active - Supervision

Type

Guardianship: Person Only

Brenda Vargas vs Agripina Vasquez

Filed

Jan 04, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

Civil Harassment

Jeanne Roney vs Ronald Moralde et al

Filed

Feb 22, 2017

Status

Dismissed

Type

Other non-PI/PD/WD Tort Unlimited (35)

Roberta Gleeson et al vs Asbestos Corporation, LTD et al

Filed

Feb 23, 2017

Status

Dismissed

Type

Asbestos Unlimited (04)

Linda Hawn vs Samantha Franks

Filed

Mar 03, 2017

Status

Dismissed

Type

Civil Harassment

Kelly Sorrell vs Kenneth Foster Bidwell

Filed

Mar 08, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

Civil Harassment

Guillermo Hernandez et al vs Mayen Shueh

Filed

Mar 22, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

Small Claims Appeals

Jagoda Alimpic vs Elizabeth H Masloff

Filed

Mar 29, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

Unlawful Detainer Residential Limited (32) - under 10,000

Karen Crouse vs Kugler Wines LLC

Filed

Apr 04, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

Gerardo G. Ayala vs Elias Castillo

Filed

Apr 10, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

Civil Harassment

Clifford Thomas vs Foster Lumber Yards Inc. et al

Filed

May 08, 2017

Status

Dismissed

Type

Auto Unlimited (22)

DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS, vs RAMONITO F VILLANUEVA et al

Filed

May 12, 2017

Status

Active

Type

Other Real Property Unlimited (26)

Greenview Hospital vs Amanda Herald

Filed

May 22, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

Enforcement of Judgment Limited (20) - under 10,000

Calvary SPV I LLC vs Joseph S Ferraro, Sr.

Filed

May 22, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000

In the Matter of Kathryn Scott Shoemaker

Filed

Jun 06, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

Change of Name/Gender

Estate of Keith D Hangman

Filed

Nov 14, 2016

Status

Inactive

Type

Decedent's Estate

XXXXX

Filed

Dec 02, 2016

Status

Active - Supervision

Type

Guardianship: Person Only

Renee Lepage vs County of Napa et al

Filed

Jan 04, 2017

Status

Active

Type

Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)

Discover Bank vs Veronica Acevedo

Filed

Jan 10, 2017

Status

Dismissed

Type

Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000

Wendy Kay Lehn vs Michael Dewitt Lehn

Filed

Jan 20, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

App. for Discovery Subpoena in Case Act. Pending Outside CA

Donald Chisham vs Traci Boles

Filed

Jan 24, 2017

Status

Inactive

Type

Civil Harassment

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.