1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

MARIA ELENA BOLANOS VS ERNIE'S MOBILE HOME TRANSPORT INC ET

Filed

Jul 08, 2016

Status

Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 10/24/2018

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

PERLA ALVAREZ HERNANDEZ VS XINGMENG DU ET AL

Filed

Jul 08, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack of Prosecution 01/08/2018

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

ILDA R CERVANTES ET AL VS NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC

Filed

Jul 11, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/16/2017

Type

Contract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

ANA PATRICIA SANTOS ET AL VS L A COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPO

Filed

Jul 11, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 10/25/2016

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

KHAREN MINASYAN VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO INC ET AL

Filed

Jul 11, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 02/07/2017

Type

Contract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

FRANCISCO JAVIER DE LA TORRE ET AL VS HONORIO OROZCO TRUCKIN

Filed

Jul 12, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 01/03/2017

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

PETAL WALKER ET AL VS S & E REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS LLC ET A

Filed

Jul 12, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack of Prosecution 02/04/2019

Type

Breach of Rental/Lease Contract (not unlawful detainer or wrongful eviction) (General Jurisdiction)

PASCUALA BERNARDINO VS VOTUM STAFFING INC ET AL

Filed

Jul 12, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 04/27/2018

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

LISA GAMBOA VS EMPIRE TRANSPORTATION INC ET AL

Filed

Jul 13, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 10/17/2017

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

MINAS GEDJEYAN VS KELLY ANN HANHART ET AL

Filed

Jul 19, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 03/01/2018

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

YOLANDA HURTADO DE RICO VS RITE AID

Filed

Jul 14, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 09/28/2017

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

VICTORIA YAMBAO VS BRADLEY BAKER ET AL

Filed

Jul 15, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 10/05/2016

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

TATYANA MARISOL ALI VS TIME WARNER ET AL

Filed

Jul 15, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 03/16/2017

Type

Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)

BLUE BRIDGE FINANCIAL LLC VS OPTIMAL HEALTH & WELLNESS CORP

Filed

Jul 20, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 08/03/2017

Type

Breach of Rental/Lease Contract (not unlawful detainer or wrongful eviction) (General Jurisdiction)

SANDRA DE PAZ VS JULIO C HERNANDEZ

Filed

Jul 20, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 11/07/2016

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

GREGORY AMES VS LINDA COLE

Filed

Jul 21, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 05/23/2017

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

OMAR A LOPEZ VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Filed

Jul 11, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 08/10/2018

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

GAYLE YASHAR ET AL VS OUE SKYSPACE LLC ET AL

Filed

Jul 13, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 01/10/2018

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

KEVIN LEE VS SHAFQUAT MALIK ET AL

Filed

Jul 12, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 07/26/2017

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

CLAUDIA MARTIN CANO VS KUKI ENTERPRISES INC ET AL

Filed

Jul 13, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 01/31/2018

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

LONISHA ANDERSON VS TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION ET AL

Filed

Jul 14, 2016

Status

Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 12/13/2018

Type

Product Liability (not asbestos or toxic/environmental) (General Jurisdiction)

BALDOMERO PEREZ VS WASTE MANAGEMENT OF CALIFORNIA INC

Filed

Jul 14, 2016

Status

Summary Judgment 03/06/2018

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

GEORGINA GONZALEZ ET AL VS BEATRIZ GUITERREZ ET AL

Filed

Jul 15, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 11/13/2017

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

NICHOLAS ALDREDGE VS ASHLEY DOWNES-TAYLOR ET AL

Filed

Jul 14, 2016

Status

Pending

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

ERIKA MARTINEZ ET AL VS MOISES PADILLA ET AL

Filed

Jul 15, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 07/20/2017

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.