1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

County of Kings vs Gay L. Leasure

Filed

Jan 28, 2002

Status

Open

Type

Family Support

County Of Kings vs Anthony A. Jauregui

Filed

Dec 04, 2002

Status

Open

Type

Family Support

Kings Federal Credit Union vs. Alexandria Medrano

Filed

Nov 09, 2017

Status

Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections $0.01 to $9,999.99

Angelita T. Mendiola vs. Victor Paul Franco

Filed

Feb 28, 2017

Status

Restraining Order Granted

Type

Domestic Violence Without Children

Juan Miranda vs. Rosalyn Solomon

Filed

Oct 18, 2017

Status

Open

Type

Dissolution With Children

County of Kings vs Hector Tello

Filed

Jul 14, 2004

Status

Open

Type

Family Support

County of Kings vs. Raul R. Gonzales

Filed

Jun 21, 2005

Status

Open

Type

Family Support

First Resolution vs. Obed Arvizu

Filed

Jul 08, 2009

Status

Closed

Type

Z - Contract Collections

County of Kings vs. Jesus Osuna

Filed

May 07, 2009

Status

Open

Type

Family Support

County of Kings vs. Raymond L. Price

Filed

Jul 06, 2009

Status

Open

Type

Family Support

A-L Financial vs. Lidia L. Ayala

Filed

Jun 27, 2011

Status

Closed

Type

Z - Contract Collections

Rosalinda Williams vs John M. Williams

Filed

Sep 06, 2011

Status

Open

Type

Dissolution Without Children

County Of Kings vs Timothy Sumaya

Filed

Jun 23, 2011

Status

Open

Type

Family Support

County of Kings vs. Steven A. Avila

Filed

May 18, 2012

Status

Open

Type

Family Support

Ronnie J. Boen, II vs. Amber B. Boen

Filed

Apr 02, 2014

Status

Judgment on Reserved Issues

Type

Dissolution With Children

State of Wisconsin vs. Chester Stevens

Filed

Mar 10, 2014

Status

Open

Type

Stmt Reg of Calif Support Order-Filed by Private Party

Abel Madrigal vs. Elida C. Lopez

Filed

Jun 04, 2015

Status

Restraining Order Granted

Type

Domestic Violence With Children

Adriana Enriquez vs. Rafael Enriquez

Filed

Nov 30, 2015

Status

Judgment

Type

Dissolution With Children

County of Kings vs. James M. Elias

Filed

Nov 30, 2015

Status

Open

Type

Department of Child Support Services - Family Support

County of Kings vs. David Gonzalez

Filed

Oct 03, 2016

Status

Judgment

Type

Department of Child Support Services - Family Support

County of Kings vs. Benjamin Henry Moreno

Filed

Oct 11, 2016

Status

Judgment

Type

Department of Child Support Services - Family Support

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.