1-25 of 1334 results

Sort By

Steve Courtney vs Pamela Howell

Filed

Jun 22, 2012

Status

Open

Type

22 Unlimited - Auto

12 Files

Anees Monifi vs Pradnya Mitroo, M.D.

Filed

Nov 27, 2013

Status

Re-Opened

Type

45 Unlimited - Medical Malpractice

52 Files

Juan Alvarez vs Lennar Fresno Inc

Filed

Dec 31, 2013

Status

Stay

Type

10 Unlimited - Construction Defect

37 Files

Raul Mendoza vs John Riggs

Filed

Nov 03, 2014

Status

Open

Type

23 Unlimited - Other PI/PD/WD

42 Files

Casey Haywood vs. River Ridge Partners/COMPLEX/ LEAD CASE

Filed

Dec 26, 2014

Status

Open

Type

10 Unlimited - Construction Defect

105 Files

Larry Brown vs. Bank of America , N.A.

Filed

Apr 13, 2015

Status

Open

Type

26 Unlimited - Other Real Property

246 Files

Ron Miller Enterprises Inc. vs. Lobel Financial Corporation/LEAD

Filed

Aug 20, 2015

Status

Open

Type

06 Unlimited - Breach of Contract/Warranty

77 Files

Cameron Shahrokhi vs. Clovis Castle Events

Filed

Nov 10, 2015

Status

Open

Type

23 Unlimited - Other PI/PD/WD

39 Files

Martin Moreno vs.Jesse Hernandez

Filed

Nov 19, 2015

Status

Open

Type

42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (not specified)

57 Files

Dick Safrazian vs. Markaya Kalani Spikes/UD

Filed

Mar 27, 2015

Status

Open

Type

32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000

5 Files

Michell Fernandez vs. Suburban Propane, L.P. // CLASS ACTION

Filed

Feb 10, 2016

Status

Open

Type

36 Unlimited - Wrongful Termination

94 Files

Ernst Vitovec vs.Lennar Fresno, Inc./COMPLEX

Filed

Mar 02, 2016

Status

Open

Type

10 Unlimited - Construction Defect

64 Files

The State of California, acting by and through the State Public Works Board vs. David Gabrielian

Filed

Jun 29, 2016

Status

Judgment

Type

14 Unlimited - Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation

49 Files

Larry Brown vs. Bank of America, N.A., a national bank

Filed

Jul 11, 2016

Status

Stay

Type

26 Unlimited - Other Real Property

178 Files

Duane Metzger vs. FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Filed

Sep 08, 2016

Status

Open

Type

06 Unlimited - Breach of Contract/Warranty

115 Files

Bertha Solorio vs. Saint Agnes Medical Center/Fresno

Filed

Dec 20, 2016

Status

Open

Type

23 Unlimited - Other PI/PD/WD

51 Files

Hugo Garibo-Espinoza vs. William Kromberg

Filed

Feb 01, 2017

Status

Open

Type

26 Unlimited - Other Real Property

44 Files

Cheri Myers vs.Northwest Surgical Development Company, Inc.

Filed

Feb 17, 2017

Status

Dismissed

Type

45 Unlimited - Medical Malpractice

180 Files

Mary Ramirez vs Ronald Walker

Filed

May 24, 2017

Status

Dismissed

Type

22 Unlimited - Auto

13 Files

Carlos Garcia vs. Ford Motor Company

Filed

Jul 10, 2017

Status

Open

Type

06 Unlimited - Breach of Contract/Warranty

18 Files

Thomas Emerzian vs. Wilsonart, LLC

Filed

Jul 24, 2017

Status

Stay

Type

16 Unlimited - Fraud

21 Files

Leonard Defendis vs Lennar Fresno, Inc. // COMPLEX

Filed

Apr 24, 2013

Status

Open

Type

10 Unlimited - Construction Defect

126 Files

Scott Felix vs People of Californa/WM

Filed

Apr 09, 2014

Status

Open

Type

02 Unlimited - Writ of Mandate

1 File

Manual Rocha, Jr. vs. George Gonzalez

Filed

Oct 23, 2014

Status

Open

Type

22 Unlimited - Auto

12 Files

The State of California vs. Jeffrey Johns

Filed

May 13, 2015

Status

Open

Type

14 Unlimited - Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation

51 Files

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 54     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.