1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

Sobrato Development VS Strauss

Filed

Mar 14, 2000

Type

General Civil

City of Oakland VS Kwong

Filed

Mar 14, 2000

Type

Small Claims

Decker VS Kevoe

Filed

Mar 15, 2000

Type

General Civil

Murco Management Inc VS Seidler

Filed

Mar 15, 2000

Type

General Civil

Poree VS Taylor

Filed

Mar 15, 2000

Type

Small Claims

Simmons VS Ramos

Filed

Mar 15, 2000

Type

General Civil

Alexander VS O'Doherty

Filed

Mar 15, 2000

Type

General Civil

Fireside Thrift Co VS Popescu

Filed

Mar 16, 2000

Type

Small Claims

City of Oakland VS Nasmyth

Filed

Mar 16, 2000

Type

Small Claims

Williams VS Tu

Filed

Mar 17, 2000

Type

General Civil

Wong VS Ratcliffe

Filed

Mar 17, 2000

Type

General Civil

Ung VS Yi

Filed

Mar 21, 2000

Type

General Civil

Wofford VS Linares

Filed

Mar 21, 2000

Type

Small Claims

Booker VS Williams

Filed

Mar 21, 2000

Type

General Civil

Zellner VS Yonque D.D.S

Filed

Mar 06, 2000

Type

Small Claims

City of Oakland VS Flournoy

Filed

Mar 21, 2000

Type

Small Claims

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.