Search anything: case name, case number, motion type, judge, or party

1-25 of 83,359 results

Michael Venuta et al vs Baren Venter

Filed

Jul 31, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

County

Napa County, CA

LANCE MUGLESTON, A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT et al vs PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Filed

Jul 31, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Other Real Property Unlimited (26)

County

Napa County, CA

Ana Y Barrios vs Carlos Enrique Flores

Filed

Jul 31, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Civil Harassment

County

Napa County, CA

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. vs Luis S Zafra

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000

County

Napa County, CA

LESLIE MANSFIELD et al vs OUTRIGGER CANOE CLUB

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Inactive

Type

App. for Discovery Subpoena in Case Act. Pending Outside CA

County

Napa County, CA

LESLIE MANSFIELD et al vs OUTRIGGER CANOE CLUB

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Inactive

Type

App. for Discovery Subpoena in Case Act. Pending Outside CA

County

Napa County, CA

LESLIE MANSFIELD et al vs OUTRIGGER CANOE CLUB

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Inactive

Type

App. for Discovery Subpoena in Case Act. Pending Outside CA

County

Napa County, CA

In the Matter of Ashley Amber Reisser

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Change of Name/Gender

County

Napa County, CA

XXXXX

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Active

Type

DV Prevention w/ Minor Children

County

Napa County, CA

Stefanie Johnson vs Jeremy W. Abbott

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

County

Napa County, CA

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A vs LOVELY DICEN

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000

County

Napa County, CA

LESLIE MANSFIELD et al vs OUTRIGGER CANOE CLUB

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Inactive

Type

App. for Discovery Subpoena in Case Act. Pending Outside CA

County

Napa County, CA

Barbara Madden et al vs Vida V. Harris

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Auto Unlimited (22)

County

Napa County, CA

LESLIE MANSFIELD et al vs OUTRIGGER CANOE CLUB

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Inactive

Type

App. for Discovery Subpoena in Case Act. Pending Outside CA

County

Napa County, CA

LESLIE MANSFIELD et al vs OUTRIGGER CANOE CLUB

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Inactive

Type

App. for Discovery Subpoena in Case Act. Pending Outside CA

County

Napa County, CA

LESLIE MANSFIELD et al vs OUTRIGGER CANOE CLUB

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Inactive

Type

App. for Discovery Subpoena in Case Act. Pending Outside CA

County

Napa County, CA

Marianne Brooks vs Joelle Mathis

Filed

Jul 30, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Civil Harassment

County

Napa County, CA

Emilio T. Jacinto vs Rocelyn O. Serrano

Filed

Jul 29, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children

County

Napa County, CA

XXXXX

Filed

Jul 27, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Dissolution w/ Minor Children

County

Napa County, CA

COLIN HOOGENDOORN vs NICHOLAS S TILLIS et al

Filed

Jul 27, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Auto Limited (22) - 10,000 to 25,000

County

Napa County, CA

XXXXX

Filed

Jul 24, 2020

Status

Active

Type

DV Prevention w/ Minor Children

County

Napa County, CA

Second Round Sub, LLC vs Jessica Owen

Filed

Jul 24, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Collections Limited by Assignee of Record

County

Napa County, CA

KELLY FRATTINI vs TRADER JOE'S COMPANY

Filed

Jul 24, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)

County

Napa County, CA

XXXXX

Filed

Jul 23, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Dept. of Child Support Services (DCSS)

County

Napa County, CA

Daniel Michael Norton vs Sheryl Nacario Macalaguing

Filed

Jul 23, 2020

Status

Active

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children

County

Napa County, CA

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we gather your results.