Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

Get an alert with new cases related to: state:"ca" AND county:"losangeles"

UMASIA L. MORRIS-GAF VS SANFORD M. SINGER, ET AL

Filed

Aug 23, 2000

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 10, 2021

Status

Dismissed - Other 06/08/2001

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL ET AL VS STEVE D STUART

Filed

Mar 26, 2003

Case Last Refreshed

May 14, 2003

Status

Dismissed - Other 05/14/2003

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

WILLIAM BENENSON ET AL VS JONATHAN BLATTMACHR ET AL

Filed

Jun 05, 2003

Case Last Refreshed

Nov 29, 2011

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 01/18/2005

Type

Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

DELFINA JIMENEZ VS MIGUEL ANGELONSO CORTEZ ET AL

Filed

Dec 23, 1998

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 13, 2021

Status

Judgment by Court 01/08/1999

Type

Civil Harassment (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Anthony Jones

IDALIA VASQUEZ VS RAMON CARTZNES

Filed

Jun 05, 2003

Case Last Refreshed

Apr 16, 2004

Status

Dismissed - Other 04/04/2004

Type

Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

ROBERT PALONIS VS. EMAXX CORP ET AL

Filed

Aug 06, 2004

Case Last Refreshed

Nov 05, 2015

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 01/03/2005

Type

Other Complaint (non-tort/non-complex) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer

IN THE MATTER OF ANAND PRAKASH SINGH

Filed

Sep 24, 2004

Case Last Refreshed

Nov 19, 2004

Status

Other Judgment 11/19/2004

Type

Civil Petition - Change of Name (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

LUCY MOLDER VS. LE PHAN

Filed

Oct 19, 1999

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 11, 2021

Status

Dismissed - Other 09/07/2000

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

HAKIM T. MAJID VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Filed

Dec 04, 2018

Case Last Refreshed

Aug 14, 2020

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack of Prosecution 08/14/2020

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

BRENDA S. HARDANI VS. SUPER SUPERIOR WAREHOUSE

Filed

Nov 14, 2001

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 08, 2021

Status

Dismissed - Other 10/09/2002

Type

Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

FRANK ORTEGA-ET AL VS MONTGOMERY WARD, INC.-ET AL

Filed

Feb 21, 2001

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 09, 2021

Status

Dismissed - Other 10/08/2001

Type

Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Master Calendar

DAVIS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC, INC. VS POWER LINE ELECTRIC ETAL

Filed

Feb 24, 2004

Case Last Refreshed

Apr 01, 2004

Status

Dismissed - Other 04/01/2004

Type

Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

CONSUMER CAUSE INC VS CLUB SOHO

Filed

Apr 03, 2002

Case Last Refreshed

Dec 18, 2002

Status

Dismissed - Other 12/06/2002

Type

Civil Rights (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

KIEU THU T NORTON VS BACOU DALLOZ USA SAFETY INC ET AL

Filed

Mar 25, 2003

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 15, 2004

Status

Dismissed - Other 12/30/2003

Type

Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MARILYN MICHELLE COLE VS. EDDIE RAY BALLARD

Filed

Oct 14, 1999

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 11, 2021

Status

Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution 04/10/2000

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

HANNA ZYLBERBERG VS MICHELLE RENEE RINCON

Filed

Oct 05, 2018

Case Last Refreshed

Aug 04, 2020

Status

Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 05/29/2020

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MI HAE CHOI VS SUN SUK KIM, ET AL.

Filed

Nov 08, 2018

Case Last Refreshed

Nov 23, 2020

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - After Court Trial 11/23/2020

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

DAVID FRANCIS VS MICHELE COHEN

Filed

Dec 10, 2018

Case Last Refreshed

Dec 06, 2021

Status

Pending

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., VS. EDDIE L. CLEVAND

Filed

Jul 10, 2002

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 22, 2016

Status

Dismissed - Other 03/30/2004

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MARIA LETICIA SANDOVAL VS PRESTIGE STATIONS INC

Filed

Jun 07, 2002

Case Last Refreshed

Sep 12, 2003

Status

Dismissed - Other 09/10/2003

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

IN THE MATTER OF BOGDAN IULIAN JUNC

Filed

Sep 28, 2004

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 13, 2005

Status

Legacy Judgment 01/13/2005

Type

Petition for Change of Name (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer

JESSE BERRY VS BLAS ATTILANO

Filed

Mar 11, 2003

Case Last Refreshed

Apr 01, 2003

Status

Judgment by Court-Petition denied 04/01/2003

Type

Civil Harassment (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judge Pro Tem

PACIFIC MALIBU DUME LLC VS CHILSON TILE & STONE, INC

Filed

Dec 27, 2018

Case Last Refreshed

Dec 27, 2018

Status

Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR on 01/29/2019

Type

Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

ERIC CARTER-ET AL VS KAISER FOUNDATION HLTH. INC.-ET AL

Filed

Feb 20, 2001

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 09, 2021

Status

Dismissed - Binding Arbitration 11/02/2001

Type

Med Malpractice (Drs & Surgeons) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Master Calendar

LARISSA SEMENDIEFF VS SHARON ROSE SCHELL, ET AL

Filed

Aug 25, 2000

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 10, 2021

Status

Dismissed - Other 07/13/2001

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.