Search anything: case name, case number, motion type, judge, or party

TIBERIO LIZZA VS. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Filed

Jan 08, 2009

Type

COMPLAINT

County

Marin County, CA

MICHAEL R FLYNN VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Filed

Sep 06, 2013

Status

Deemed Complete (No Remand from Federal Court) 03/11/2014

Type

Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage tort (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

VAHRAM DARBINYAN ET AL VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Filed

Aug 10, 2016

Status

Deemed Complete (No Remand from Federal Court) 02/15/2015

Type

Negligent Breach of Contract/Warranty (no fraud) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

BIGGS -V- ALLSTATE INDEMNITY

Filed

Jul 29, 2016

Status

REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) 08/28/2018

Type

CIVIL

County

San Bernardino County, CA

ROSALBA GONZALEZ VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Filed

Feb 28, 2008

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/01/2009

Type

Other Contract Dispute (not breach/insurance/fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

JOANNE ALVA VS ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

Filed

Jan 25, 2018

Status

Deemed Complete (No Remand from Federal Court) 03/12/2019

Type

Insurance Coverage (not complex) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

NANCY GIBBS VS ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

Filed

Feb 04, 2008

Status

Legacy Judgment 04/08/2009

Type

Other Commercial/Business Tort (not fraud/ breach of contract) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

DEREK P DOTSON ET AL VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Filed

Jan 19, 2017

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 12/29/2017

Type

Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

JUNG EUN KIM VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO

Filed

Jan 30, 2014

Status

Summary Judgment 05/02/2016

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE

Filed

May 24, 2017

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 10/29/2018

Type

Insurance Coverage (not complex) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MAXIM TSELEVICH ET AL VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIF

Filed

May 31, 2012

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 10/30/2013

Type

Insurance Coverage (not complex) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

HARRY R HIBBS VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Filed

Apr 28, 2005

Status

Trial Set

Type

Misc Complaints - Other

County

Ventura County, CA

RITA R SIEBER VS ALLSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Filed

Dec 11, 2006

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 03/25/2008

Type

Insurance Coverage (not complex) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

LIEBERMAN VS MESHKIN

Filed

Sep 15, 1995

Type

General Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

VARDAN TOROSYAN VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Filed

Oct 07, 2004

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 03/03/2006

Type

Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ET AL VS TOTAL CARE MEDICA

Filed

Oct 05, 2012

Status

Pending

Type

Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

FEDERICO GONZALEZ ET AL VS CHAD HAGOBIAN

Filed

May 14, 2010

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/08/2012

Type

Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIF ET AL VS PRIMA CARE MEDICAL GRO

Filed

Aug 22, 2012

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 01/30/2015

Type

Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS WONGUEN CHANG ET AL

Filed

Apr 03, 2014

Status

Legacy Judgment 11/22/2016

Type

Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

BLAIR VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Filed

Jul 19, 2000

Type

CONTRACT/WARRANTY

County

San Francisco County, CA

86 Files

RICHARD EHLE ET AL VS HOFMANN CO

Filed

Aug 04, 1986

Status

ACTIVE

Type

CIVIL

County

Contra Costa County, CA

BRENDA SPRIGGS VS. SWEET &. BAKER INSURANCE BROKERS, INC

Filed

May 04, 2004

Type

SUBROGATION/INSURANCE

County

San Francisco County, CA

74 Files

Centex Homes vs. Ad Land Venture

Filed

Oct 12, 2011

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

19 Files

1

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we gather your results.