Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

Get an alert with new cases related to: "THOMAS JAMIE"

LESTELLE, EVELYN - CONSERVATORSHIP

Filed

Apr 12, 2011

Case Last Refreshed

Aug 31, 2020

Status

Court Supervision Terminated 08/19/2020

Type

Conservatorship (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Mitchell L.

PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A VS. AMY KROGEN et al

Case Last Refreshed

Sep 06, 2007

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

ANDREW JEAN & EVELYN ROSE LESTELLE REVOCABLE TRUST

Filed

Jun 03, 2014

Case Last Refreshed

Dec 01, 2020

Status

Open 06/03/2014

Type

Trust (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. David S.

AMY KROGEN VS. ANDREA BEGA et al

Case Last Refreshed

Sep 09, 2008

Type

MONEY

County

San Francisco County, CA

2 Files

CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.),N.A. VS. JAMIE THOMAS et al

Case Last Refreshed

Apr 02, 2009

Type

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File

EMC Mortagage Corporation VS Thomas

Filed

Feb 14, 2002

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 15, 2021

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

HOWELLS V HOWELLS

Filed

Nov 10, 1999

Case Last Refreshed

Oct 03, 2018

Status

Judgment

County

Kern County, CA

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation vs. Jamie Thomas

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

County

San Joaquin County, CA

THOMAS VS THOMAS

Filed

Mar 13, 2007

Case Last Refreshed

Jul 22, 2019

Status

Judgment

County

Kern County, CA

CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMINITY EXCHANGE VS THOMAS

Filed

Jun 19, 2006

Case Last Refreshed

Apr 21, 2014

Status

Dismissed

County

Kern County, CA

James O. Hamilton Living Trust

Filed

Jun 03, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Aug 14, 2019

Status

Open

County

Fresno County, CA

Jamie Thomas VS Pennette Mata

Case Last Refreshed

Dec 26, 2020

Status

Pending

Type

Domestic Violence without children

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Judge

Hon. Unassigned

ZONOBIA THOMAS VS JAMIE THOMAS

Filed

Jun 26, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Jul 16, 2013

Status

Statistical Disposition 07/17/2013

Type

DV Prevention w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Christine

JAMIE THOMAS VS. NICOLE N. MEALS

Filed

Jan 24, 2005

Case Last Refreshed

Dec 22, 2015

Status

Dism for Lack of Pros-Petn off-cal 04/11/2005

Type

Civil Harassment (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Joseph Hunt vs Jamie Thomas - DISMISSED

Filed

Jun 01, 2017

Case Last Refreshed

Sep 23, 2018

Status

Dismissed

County

Fresno County, CA

Judge

Hon. Tharpe, D Tyler

B.A. LANE VS INFINITY INSURANCE

Filed

Nov 17, 2009

Case Last Refreshed

Nov 15, 2009

Status

Consolidated (Non-lead case) 02/03/2010

Type

Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

IN THE MATTER OF JAMIE MARIE THOMAS

Filed

Jul 19, 1999

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 10, 2021

Status

Judgment by Court-Petition Granted 09/07/1999

Type

Civil Petition - Change of Name (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

JOSEPH N THOMAS VS JAMIE THOMAS

Filed

Nov 07, 2016

Case Last Refreshed

Sep 25, 2019

Status

Statistical Disposition 09/16/2019

Type

Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Lawrence P.

JAMIE KEYWAUNA THOMAS VS AARON M. SILBERMAN

Filed

Aug 19, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Aug 15, 2023

Status

Pending

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

LOS ANGELES COUNTY VS LIVINGSTON, THOMAS JAMIE SR.

Filed

Jul 06, 1999

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 03, 2021

Status

Statistical Disposition 12/01/2008

Type

Dept. of Child Support Services (DCSS) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

JAMIE THOMAS VS. MICHAEL SWANSON, ET AL.

Filed

Oct 04, 2000

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 08, 2021

Status

Req. for Dismissal - Entire Action 02/08/2001

Type

Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. THOMAS JAMIE LIVINGSTON, JR

Filed

Mar 17, 2017

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 15, 2021

Status

Statistical Disposition 02/26/2019

Type

Dept. of Child Support Services (DCSS) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

GDN KASSIDY ANNE CHESSER

Filed

May 19, 2004

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 24, 2008

Status

Judgment

County

Kern County, CA

State of California, Employment Development Department vs. Thomas, Jamie P.

Filed

Jan 20, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 19, 2014

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

2 Files

State of California, Employment Development Department vs. Thomas, Jamie P.

Filed

Mar 18, 2014

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 17, 2014

Type

Other employment

County

Sacramento County, CA

1 2     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.