Search anything: case name, case number, motion type, judge, or party

GARY BASS ET AL VS TARZANA GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION E

Filed

Aug 05, 2015

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 12/16/2015

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

EMIL MATUSENKO ET AL VS DALCO FORENSIC CONSULTANTS INC ET AL

Filed

Sep 13, 2018

Status

Pending

Type

Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

ULISES DURAN VS FRANK TICA, ET AL.

Filed

Oct 25, 2018

Status

Pending

Type

Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

TARZANA GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSN VS LDT INVESTMENTS INC ET A

Filed

Mar 06, 2013

Status

Dismissed - Other 06/11/2013

Type

Other Contract (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

1

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.