Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Marcy Krinsk"

Finkelstein vs Krinsk

Filed

Mar 07, 2019

Case Last Refreshed

Aug 21, 2020

Status

Pending

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

San Diego County, CA

Krinsk vs. Luxury Link LLC

Filed

Nov 05, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Apr 17, 2014

Status

Dismissed

Type

Business Tort

County

San Diego County, CA

Jerry L Harris vs. Jeffrey R Krinsk

Filed

Apr 26, 2010

Case Last Refreshed

Aug 21, 2019

Status

Appeal

Type

Other Real Property

County

San Diego County, CA

Marcy Krinsk vs. Monster Beverage Corporation

Filed

Jun 19, 2014

Case Last Refreshed

Sep 17, 2018

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Business Tort

County

San Diego County, CA

Marcy Krinsk vs Grocery Outlet Inc

Filed

Nov 19, 2014

Case Last Refreshed

Dec 15, 2015

Status

Dismissed

Type

Product Liability

County

San Diego County, CA

MARCY KRINSK VS. Whitewave Foods Company

Filed

Aug 05, 2014

Case Last Refreshed

Aug 27, 2014

Status

Removed to Federal Court

Type

Business Tort

County

San Diego County, CA

Marcy Krinsk vs. The Container Store Inc

Filed

Feb 15, 2011

Case Last Refreshed

Jun 27, 2017

Status

Dismissed

Type

Business Tort

County

San Diego County, CA

1

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.