Search anything: case name, case number, motion type, judge, or party

MABEL MILES VS CARLSON JACKSON ET AL

Filed

Jun 09, 2015

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 05/20/2016

Type

Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MARIA VASQUEZ ET AL VS CARLOS JONES ET AL

Filed

Dec 23, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 12/16/2016

Type

Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

AGINETTE WHEELER VS LOTTIE COHEN ET AL

Filed

Aug 25, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 02/16/2016

Type

Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

BING KONG TONG ASSOCIATION ET AL VS BING KONG TONG BENEVOLEN

Filed

Jun 10, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 02/24/2016

Type

Defamation (slander/libel) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

VICTOR G. MYERS, ET AL VS FAIRFAX DEVELOPMENT GROUP, ET AL

Filed

Jan 03, 2008

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/11/2015

Type

Securities Litigation Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Bright Now! Dental Vs Exclusive Debt Recovery

Filed

Jul 03, 2007

Type

CIVIL - UNLIMITED - BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY

County

Orange County, CA

1

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we gather your results.