Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

Jesus Gomez vs. CSAA Insurance Exchange

Filed

Sep 26, 2019

Status

Open

County

Fresno County, CA

19 Files

Robert Marquez vs Johan Gomez

Filed

Sep 09, 2020

Status

Open

County

Fresno County, CA

1 File

Eddie Gomez vs. General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Filed

Jan 19, 2016

Status

Dismissed

County

Fresno County, CA

9 Files

Santiago Lopez Gomez vs. MACS Farm Services, LLC

Filed

Jun 18, 2020

Status

Open

County

Fresno County, CA

4 Files

Sergio Gomez vs Ardagh Glass Inc./LC

Filed

Sep 13, 2017

Status

Dismissed

County

Fresno County, CA

5 Files

De La Torre, Maria et al vs Carver, Karen Elizabeth et al

Filed

Jan 24, 2019

Status

Dismissed

County

Butte County, CA

4 Files

In the Matter of Oliverio Gomez

Filed

Mar 13, 2014

Status

Case Closed - Approval Of Final Distribution

County

Ventura County, CA

In the Matter of Frank Flores

Filed

Jun 20, 2013

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

In the Matter of Israel Olmos & Destiny Rodriguez

Filed

Apr 19, 2012

Status

Pending

County

Ventura County, CA

In the Matter of Gomez

Filed

May 19, 2017

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

In The Matter Of Esmeralda Jessica Gomez

Filed

Dec 04, 2018

Status

Pending

County

Ventura County, CA

In the Matter of Gomez Bryant

Filed

Sep 12, 2018

Status

Pending

County

Ventura County, CA

In the Matter of Edidsabel Gomez

Filed

Jun 27, 2013

Status

Pending

County

Ventura County, CA

CONSERVATORSHIP OF MELQUIADES GOMEZ

Type

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE

County

San Francisco County, CA

In the Matter of Earvin Gomez

Filed

Feb 11, 2016

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. vs. Yolanda Gomez

Filed

Aug 29, 2018

Status

Dismissed

County

Fresno County, CA

10 Files

Maria Alicia Gomez vs. Angelina Leon

Filed

Aug 08, 2017

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

Blanca E. Gomez vs. California Mushroom Farm Inc.

Filed

Aug 14, 2007

Status

Removed to Federal Court

County

Ventura County, CA

ISSAM N KASSIS VS. ELPIDIO GOMEZ et al

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

3 Files

In the Matter of Citlali Gomez-Sandoval

Filed

Dec 21, 2016

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

GUARDIANSHIP OF IVAN GERMAN BALTAZAR GOMEZ

Type

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF PERSON

County

San Francisco County, CA

In The Matter Joshua Edward Gomez

Filed

Aug 09, 2007

Status

Pending

County

Ventura County, CA

Maria Gomez vs. Vicente Gomez

Filed

Aug 17, 2012

Status

Post Judgment

County

Ventura County, CA

IN RE: OLMAN ALONSO GOMEZ CACERES

Type

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File

EFRAIN GOMEZ VS. CARMEN GOMEZ

Type

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.