Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

INTERNATIONAL SERVICES INC VS VISTA HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT GROU

Filed

Mar 16, 2010

Case Last Refreshed

Jul 26, 2010

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 07/06/2010

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

BLEAU FOX VS HAYEL HAWATMEH

Filed

Nov 10, 2014

Case Last Refreshed

May 11, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 11/17/2015

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

ADAM HENNINGER VS GREGORY LUSK ET AL

Filed

Jan 03, 2008

Case Last Refreshed

Sep 12, 2019

Status

Pending

Type

Contract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

REETU DUA ET AL VS RICHARD JACOBY ET AL

Filed

Sep 19, 2016

Case Last Refreshed

Nov 15, 2017

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 09/07/2017

Type

Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

ON-SITE LASERMEDIC CORP VS STEVEN JOHN FIGUEROA ET AL

Filed

Nov 30, 2015

Case Last Refreshed

Dec 12, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 08/30/2016

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

JAAROME WILSON VS SMILE FOODS INC

Filed

Jun 23, 2011

Case Last Refreshed

Oct 30, 2012

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 04/13/2012

Type

Civil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MARIA MOLINA VS. KAZI FOOD INC., ET AL

Filed

Jul 08, 2011

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 18, 2013

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 01/16/2013

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

NOIL USA INC VS HARVESTING KING TRADING USA

Filed

Oct 25, 2017

Case Last Refreshed

Apr 02, 2018

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 12/21/2017

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

THOMAS MUNDY VS KAZI FOODS INC

Filed

Jan 15, 2010

Case Last Refreshed

Jun 01, 2010

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/02/2010

Type

Civil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer

COLONIAL PACIFIC LEASING CORPORATION ET AL VS ZUBAIR KAZI ET

Filed

Apr 19, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Jan 14, 2016

Status

Legacy Judgment 06/16/2014

Type

Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

COAST TO COAST WATER DAMAGE & RESTORATION INC VS SERPINA LOC

Filed

May 21, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Jun 25, 2013

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/25/2013

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

GRETA ZAKHARIAN VS KAZI FOODS INC

Filed

Jun 13, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Jun 10, 2013

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/10/2013

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Teresa Sanchez

NOIL USA INC VS ENE TRANSPORT INC

Filed

Oct 25, 2017

Case Last Refreshed

Jul 18, 2018

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack of Prosecution 07/19/2018

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

3H CORPORATION VS INTERGRATED TECHNOLOGIES CONSULTING

Filed

Oct 22, 2008

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 03, 2009

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 11/12/2008

Type

Other Contract Dispute (not breach/insurance/fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

NOIL USA INC VS BLACK ROCK LOGISTICS

Filed

Oct 24, 2017

Case Last Refreshed

Sep 10, 2018

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 09/11/2018

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

GAREEB LAW GROUP VS PARVEZ M SHAIKH ET AL

Filed

Oct 30, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Jul 29, 2014

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 07/28/2014

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

STEPHANIE TORREZ VS RAIDAH FOODS INC ET AL

Filed

May 17, 2011

Case Last Refreshed

Sep 20, 2012

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 09/21/2012

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

INTERNATIONAL SERVICES INC ET AL VS INTRACORP LOS ANGELES LL

Filed

Apr 01, 2010

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 13, 2014

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 09/30/2010

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

FIRST REGIONAL BANK VS ODED WOLF

Filed

Dec 30, 2008

Case Last Refreshed

May 25, 2015

Status

Other Judgment 09/30/2009

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

HANY BEKHIT VS ABBEY CALIFORNIA PARKING INC ET AL

Filed

Sep 23, 2009

Case Last Refreshed

Jul 01, 2012

Status

Consolidated (Non-lead case) 10/20/2010

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

SAM KARAWIA ET AL VS ADVANTAGE DECK COATINGS INC

Filed

Jun 26, 2008

Case Last Refreshed

May 01, 2012

Status

Legacy Judgment 04/13/2010

Type

Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

COMPLETE BUILDING MAINTENANCE INC ET AL VS PETERSEN AUTOMOTI

Filed

Apr 01, 2010

Case Last Refreshed

Dec 09, 2010

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 12/10/2010

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

LAUREN MAYHEW VS KRIS LAMANS ET AL

Filed

Feb 14, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 15, 2017

Status

Legacy Judgment 10/07/2013

Type

Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MARIA MARSH VS INTERNATIONAL SERVCES INC

Filed

Jul 10, 2008

Case Last Refreshed

Aug 26, 2009

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 03/24/2009

Type

Civil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

JAIME ROBLES VS MAJOR PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC

Filed

Sep 21, 2007

Case Last Refreshed

May 11, 2008

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 05/12/2008

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

1 2 3     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.