Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Does 1 To 20, Inclusive"

Zitrin vs Hough

Filed

Nov 04, 2019

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 16, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

PAUL FOX, ET AL. VS ESTATE OF GEORGIOS K. PSARA AKA GEORGIOS PSARA, DECEDENT, INDIVIDUALLY AND BY AND THROUGH ITS ADMINISTRATOR, KYRIACOS G. PSARA, AND DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

Filed

Jan 29, 2019

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 22, 2021

Status

Pending

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. vs. Jessica Hernandez, et al.

Filed

Aug 05, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 16, 2021

Status

Dismissed

County

Sonoma County, CA

Middlesex Insurance Company v Reynolds

Filed

Nov 10, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 12, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Arevalo vs Rosario

Filed

Jan 03, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 16, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Berg vs. Okon

Filed

May 01, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 17, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Nusair vs Lopez

Filed

Jan 02, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 16, 2021

Status

Dismissed

County

Sonoma County, CA

PRADO 1474 SACRAMENTO,LLC VS. LUANN BRAZIL et al

Case Last Refreshed

Oct 30, 2005

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

MAY WONG VS. BAGOOD, LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A. LEAH ET AL

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 09, 2015

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File

Nance vs Martinez

Filed

May 28, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 16, 2021

Status

Dismissed

County

Sonoma County, CA

785 MARKET STREET, LLC. VS. KNOTEL 785 MARKET LLC. ET AL

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

Koran vs Grinsell

Filed

Apr 22, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 15, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Progressive Select Insurance Company vs Jayne

Filed

Jun 19, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 15, 2021

Status

Adjudicated

County

Sonoma County, CA

351 TURK STREET PARTNERSHIP VS. JEREMY DE LEON ET AL

Case Last Refreshed

Oct 19, 2017

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File

Beecher vs. Ames

Filed

Feb 13, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 16, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Monize vs. Hug

Filed

Jan 15, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Apr 10, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

Progressive West Insurance Company vs Vasquez Hernandez

Filed

Aug 14, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 16, 2021

Status

Adjudicated

County

Sonoma County, CA

McEwan vs. B. Tiapon Grocery, INC.

Filed

Jun 17, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Apr 28, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

CIVIC PLAZA ASSOCIATES LLC. VS. ENERGICA MOTOR COMPANY INC ET AL

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 08, 2018

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

311 CALIFORNIA STREET, LLC VS. STREET FOOD MARKET 4, LLC ET AL

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 02, 2021

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

SCV-267413

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 16, 2021

County

Sonoma County, CA

Progressive Select Insurance Company vs Moonene

Filed

Aug 14, 2020

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 16, 2021

Status

Active

County

Sonoma County, CA

T-C 888 BRANNAN OWNER LLC VS. NESHIAN MERIC ET AL

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 20, 2021

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS et al VS. CECILIA RAMOS et al

Case Last Refreshed

Dec 16, 2010

Type

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 256     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.