Cases for party/D/B/A Bears Playground in New York

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: party/"D/B/A Bears Playground"

10 Files
Filed

Jan 16, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Other Negligence (Trip and Fall)

Judge

Hon. Dakota Ramseur Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dakota Ramseur

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

16 Files
Filed

Jun 06, 2018

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Other (trip and fall)

Judge

Hon. Dakota Ramseur Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dakota Ramseur

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

13 Files
Filed

Mar 29, 2016

Status

Disposed

County

New York County, NY

Judge

Hon. Alexander M Tisch

20 Files
Filed

Mar 05, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Motor Vehicle

Judge

Hon. Dakota Ramseur Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dakota Ramseur

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

15 Files
Filed

Jun 30, 2017

Status

Disposed

Type

Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff

Judge

Hon. Denise F. Molia Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Denise F. Molia

County

Suffolk County, NY

Court

Suffolk County Supreme Court

14 Files
Filed

Jun 06, 2018

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability)

Judge

Hon. Laurence Love

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

13 Files
Filed

Sep 26, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

Torts - Other Negligence (General Negligence)

Judge

Hon. Laurence Love

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

43 Files
Filed

Apr 14, 2017

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial - Contract

Judge

Hon. Jerry Garguilo Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Jerry Garguilo

County

Suffolk County, NY

Court

Suffolk County Supreme Court

5 Files
Filed

Apr 01, 2016

Status

Stayed

Type

Torts - Other Negligence (Slip and Fall)

Judge

Hon. Maurice E. Muir Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Maurice E. Muir

County

Queens County, NY

Court

Queens County Supreme Court

15 Files
Filed

Jan 23, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Other Negligence (Premises, Municipal)

Judge

Hon. Lyle E Frank Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lyle E Frank

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

5 Files
Filed

Aug 06, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Other (Personal Injury)

Judge

Hon. Laurence Love

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

Filed

Jul 26, 2016

Status

Disposed

County

Bronx County, NY

Judge

Hon. Thompson, Hon. Kenneth

Filed

Aug 16, 2018

Status

Active

County

Bronx County, NY

Judge

Hon. Danziger, Hon. Mitchell J.

Filed

Mar 13, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Other (Slip and Fall)

Judge

Hon. Joseph Farneti Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Joseph Farneti

County

Suffolk County, NY

Court

Suffolk County Supreme Court

36 Files
Filed

Feb 02, 2017

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial - Contract

Judge

Hon. Paul I Marx

County

Putnam County, NY

Court

Putnam County Supreme Court

17 Files
Filed

Apr 13, 2015

Status

Disposed

Type

Tort

Judge

Hon. Victor J Alfieri Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Victor J Alfieri

County

Rockland County, NY

Court

Rockland County Supreme Court

21 Files
Filed

Feb 23, 2017

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Other Negligence (Trip and fall)

Judge

Hon. Lyle E Frank Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lyle E Frank

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

17 Files
Filed

Oct 17, 2018

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Motor Vehicle

Judge

Hon. Gerard J Neri Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Gerard J Neri

County

Onondaga County, NY

Court

Onondaga County Supreme Court

14 Files
Filed

Sep 29, 2017

Status

Disposed

County

Richmond County, NY

Judge

Hon. Charles M Troia

38 Files
Filed

Apr 23, 2018

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Other (Premises Liability SF)

Judge

Hon. Dakota Ramseur Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Dakota Ramseur

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

35 Files
Filed

Jul 07, 2015

Status

Disposed

Type

Tort

Judge

Hon. Trial Assignment Part

County

Rockland County, NY

Court

Rockland County Supreme Court

Filed

May 14, 2018

Status

Active

Type

Torts - Other Negligence (sidewalk - trip and fall)

Judge

Hon. Laurence Love

County

New York County, NY

Court

New York County Supreme Court

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope