Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Cach, Llc"

CACH LLC VS JEFF LIEBERMAN

Filed

Mar 07, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 16, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

4 Files

CACH LLC VS ANA JUAREZ ET AL

Filed

May 22, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 02, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

2 Files

CACH LLC VS RAUL FIGUEROA

Filed

Oct 31, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 12, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

3 Files

CACH,LLC vs ANGELICA ROSALES, et al

Filed

Jul 12, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 11, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

2 Files

CACH, LLC vs ADAM J BOVE, et al

Filed

Jul 11, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 11, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

5 Files

CACH, LLC VS REYNALDO B. GONZALEZ

Filed

Jun 27, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 14, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

3 Files

CACH LLC vs. Sharp

Filed

Jun 02, 2014

Case Last Refreshed

Jun 20, 2014

Status

Dismissed

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

CACH LLC VS NICHOLAS J MURR

Filed

Jun 20, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 14, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

3 Files

CACH LLC VS ERIC M COLBY

Filed

Aug 26, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 11, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

4 Files

CACH LLC vs. Reidel

Filed

Dec 31, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

May 03, 2013

Status

Dismissed

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

San Diego County, CA

CACH LLC vs MICHELLE P CHANG, et al

Filed

Dec 24, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 13, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

4 Files

CACH LLC VS PAUL BENNETT

Filed

Jan 25, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Mar 01, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

4 Files

CACH, LLC VS. ANN M DISTEFANO

Filed

Apr 12, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 12, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

2 Files

CACH, LLC V TERESA GARCIA

Filed

Jan 09, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 12, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

CACH, LLC VS RICHARD D WILSON

Filed

Apr 24, 2015

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 15, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

5 Files

CACH LLC VS DAYNA M BONETTI

Filed

Mar 12, 2014

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 11, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

3 Files

CACH, LLC VS ANGELA HOBSON

Filed

Jun 27, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 14, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

CACH,LLC vs CHRISTOPHER BAKER, et al

Filed

Jul 12, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 11, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

4 Files

CACH, LLC VS. MARIA CASTILLO

Filed

Jan 23, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 12, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

CACH LLC VS HUGO R HERNANDEZ

Filed

May 16, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 12, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

2 Files

CACH, LLC V CATHERINE TOSCANO

Filed

Oct 17, 2012

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 25, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

5 Files

CACH, LLC VS ALICIA FORTALEZA

Filed

Mar 25, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 12, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

CACH LLC VS JAMES D KRISTOFFERSON

Filed

Mar 05, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 16, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

4 Files

CACH LLC VS PETER CHUN

Filed

Jul 29, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 26, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

10 Files

CACH,LLC VS. PAQUITA BARRETO

Filed

Jun 27, 2013

Case Last Refreshed

Feb 13, 2021

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

3 Files

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.