Cases for wyckoff, michael in Florida

9 Files
Filed

Oct 14, 2010

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. GALEN, PHYLLIS Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for GALEN, PHYLLIS

30 Files
Filed

Mar 26, 2007

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. DIVISION A, CIRCUIT

19 Files
Filed

Mar 02, 2009

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. DIVISION C, CIRCUIT

Filed

Dec 12, 2007

Type

DELINQUENT TENANT - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

1 File
Filed

May 30, 2017

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Holder, P. Gregory Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Holder, P. Gregory

4 Files
Filed

Mar 19, 2023

Status

OPEN

County

Charlotte County, FL

Judge

Hon. GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

32 Files
Filed

May 30, 2017

Status

Closed

Type

Auto Negligence

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Holder, Gregory. P

Filed

May 29, 2015

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. WALKER, STEPHEN Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for WALKER, STEPHEN

Filed

Aug 09, 2016

Status

CLOS

Type

DISSOLUTION 2010

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. WALKER, STEPHEN Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for WALKER, STEPHEN

1 File
Filed

Dec 16, 2008

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. COUNTY CIVIL DIVISION 1

110 Files
Filed

Dec 11, 2017

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. RUHL, MARIA Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for RUHL, MARIA

40 Files
Filed

Sep 18, 2008

Status

CLOS

Type

MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - CIRCUIT

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. DIVISION C, CIRCUIT

Filed

Jul 19, 2010

Type

REAL PROP - NON-HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE3 $250,000 or more

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. WILLIAMS, AMY M Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for WILLIAMS, AMY M

5 Files
Filed

Aug 23, 2007

Status

CLOSED

County

Manatee County, FL

Judge

Hon. LON S AREND Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for LON S AREND

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope