Cases for wal mart stores east, lp in Florida

Filed

Mar 08, 2021

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Feb 02, 2021

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Sep 28, 2012

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Oct 27, 2020

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Mar 23, 2018

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Jul 09, 2015

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Mar 29, 2021

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Oct 14, 2019

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Jun 06, 2011

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

11 Files
Filed

Jun 26, 2020

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Mar 27, 2021

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

13 Files
Filed

Nov 02, 2020

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Apr 25, 2011

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Jun 04, 2020

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Apr 01, 2011

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Dec 19, 2014

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

2 Files
Filed

Jun 24, 2021

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Mar 26, 2021

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

2 Files
Filed

Apr 30, 2021

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Feb 25, 2011

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

May 13, 2020

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Jul 19, 2018

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

10 Files
Filed

Mar 12, 2020

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

9 Files
Filed

Sep 27, 2019

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope