Search anything: case name, case number, motion type, judge, or party

FERNANDO ANAYA VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Filed

Oct 08, 2015

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 07/17/2017

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MELINA ESCOBEDO VS CALIFORNIA BEAR CREDIT UNION

Filed

Jan 14, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 03/23/2015

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

ROSARIO DAVID VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC ET AL

Filed

Oct 11, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 03/02/2018

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MARTHA NASTASE VS AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC ET AL

Filed

Aug 08, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 02/05/2018

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MIRNA JAUREGUI VS EL POLLO LOCO INC ET AL

Filed

Feb 24, 2012

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 12/27/2012

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

RITA KOGAN VS IPC THE HOSPITALIST CO INC

Filed

Nov 03, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 10/06/2015

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MONIQUE GIVHAN VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Filed

Oct 29, 2015

Status

Request for Dismissal - Before Trial Within 60 days of Settlement Conference 05/09/2019

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

RICHARD PANEK VS CITY OF LONG BEACH

Filed

Feb 24, 2016

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/15/2017

Type

Civil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

SCOTT GARRABRANT VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Filed

Feb 21, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 09/23/2015

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

ENRICO PAYAD VS OPI PRODUCTS INC

Filed

Mar 30, 2011

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/07/2012

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

JOHN P CHAVEZ SR VS AMERIGAS PROPANE INC ET AL

Filed

Jul 20, 2012

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 02/04/2014

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

BURGOS VS UNITED AIRLINES INC

Filed

Nov 13, 2000

Type

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS

County

San Francisco County, CA

9 Files

MIGUEL ALVAREZ VS PEERLESS BUILDING MAINTENANCE INC

Filed

Jul 11, 2016

Status

Summary Judgment 07/06/2017

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

CORINNE MARIA GONZALES VS SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC

Filed

May 21, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 05/24/2016

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

ROBERT NELSON VS TECHNICOLOR INC ET AL

Filed

Mar 01, 2006

Status

Legacy Judgment 04/09/2007

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

PETER DAYTON VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO-WATER ENTERPRISE ET AL

Filed

Mar 15, 2017

Type

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE

County

San Francisco County, CA

ROWENA CHACON VS WAL-MART STORES INC ET AL

Filed

Nov 12, 2010

Status

Dismissed - Other 08/15/2012

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

RONALD PODOSKE VS. GAP, INC., A CORPORATION et al

Filed

Sep 21, 2004

Type

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE

County

San Francisco County, CA

16 Files

DONALD MCGUIRE VS BURLINGTON NORTHERN AND SANTA FE RAILWAY

Filed

Dec 29, 2005

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 01/25/2008

Type

Civil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

CHRIS V. MATAL SOL VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO et al

Filed

Mar 11, 2008

Type

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE

County

San Francisco County, CA

20 Files

ELLIOT GALINDO VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Filed

Jun 07, 2013

Status

Summary Judgment 01/25/2016

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

DAVID CARLOS VS THE BOEING COMPANY

Filed

Oct 07, 2016

Status

Jury Verdict 04/10/2018

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

FLOYD RICHARDSON VS MATRIX SERVICE INC

Filed

Aug 06, 2007

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 12/12/2008

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

SONIA HOLGUIN VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Filed

Dec 06, 2017

Status

Pending

Type

Civil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

MARK HAMMOND VS THE LOS ANGELES SOUTHERN BAPTIST ASSN ET AL

Filed

Jan 19, 2017

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Conditional Settlement) 12/07/2018

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

1 2 3     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we gather your results.