Cases for sposato, melissa a. in New York

10 Files
Filed

Jan 26, 2015

Status

Disposed

Type

Foreclosure (residential mortgage)

Judge

Hon. Timothy J Dufficy Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Timothy J Dufficy

County

Queens County, NY

Court

Queens County Supreme Court

24 Files
Filed

Jun 14, 2013

Status

Disposed

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

Judge

Hon. William J Giacomo Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for William J Giacomo

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

18 Files
Filed

Mar 29, 2017

Status

Disposed

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

Judge

Hon. _ Fsp-R

County

Rockland County, NY

Court

Rockland County Supreme Court

19 Files
Filed

Jun 22, 2017

Status

Disposed

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

Judge

Hon. _ Fsp-R

County

Rockland County, NY

Court

Rockland County Supreme Court

6 Files
Filed

Mar 17, 2014

Status

Disposed

Type

Foreclosure (residential mortgage)

Judge

Hon. Thomas Whelan Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Thomas Whelan

County

Suffolk County, NY

Court

Suffolk County Supreme Court

26 Files
Filed

Aug 09, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Orange County, NY

Judge

Hon. James L Hyer Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for James L Hyer

12 Files
Filed

Mar 03, 2022

Status

Disposed

County

Saratoga County, NY

Judge

Hon. James E Walsh Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for James E Walsh

26 Files
Filed

Aug 09, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Orange County, NY

Judge

Hon. James L Hyer Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for James L Hyer

18 Files
Filed

Dec 13, 2016

Status

Disposed

County

Orange County, NY

16 Files
Filed

Dec 11, 2013

Status

Disposed

County

Suffolk County, NY

Judge

Hon. James Hudson Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for James Hudson

16 Files
Filed

Dec 11, 2013

Status

Disposed

Type

Foreclosure (residential mortgage)

Judge

Hon. James Hudson Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for James Hudson

County

Suffolk County, NY

Court

Suffolk County Supreme Court

8 Files
Filed

May 01, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

Judge

Hon. Craig J Doran Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Craig J Doran

County

Steuben County, NY

Court

Steuben County Supreme Court

26 Files
Filed

Apr 04, 2018

Status

Disposed

County

Rockland County, NY

Judge

Hon. Sherri L Eisenpress Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Sherri L Eisenpress

8 Files
Filed

Feb 13, 2019

Status

Disposed

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

Judge

Hon. Mandatory Appearance Part (Map2(R))

County

Rockland County, NY

Court

Rockland County Supreme Court

6 Files
Filed

Apr 17, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

Judge

Hon. Mandatory Appearance Part (Map2(R))

County

Rockland County, NY

Court

Rockland County Supreme Court

6 Files
Filed

Jun 03, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Greene County, NY

Judge

Hon. Adam W Silverman Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Adam W Silverman

2 Files
Filed

Apr 15, 2019

Status

Active

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

Judge

Hon. Foreclosure Conference Part

County

Niagara County, NY

Court

Niagara County Supreme Court

1 File
Filed

Jan 15, 2019

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

County

Queens County, NY

Court

Queens County Supreme Court

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope