Cases for scottsdale insurance company in Florida

16 Files
Filed

May 29, 2019

Status

CLOSED

Type

INSURANCE CLAIM

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

2 Files
Filed

Jul 19, 2021

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

6 Files
Filed

Mar 15, 2018

Status

Disposed

Type

Contract and Indebtedness

County

Collier County, FL

Judge

Hon. Unassigned Judge

1 File
Filed

Jun 01, 2021

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

39 Files
Filed

Feb 13, 2018

Status

Disposed

County

Collier County, FL

Judge

Hon. Foster, Joseph G Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Foster, Joseph G

Filed

Apr 19, 2021

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

18 Files
Filed

May 02, 2018

Type

INSURANCE CLAIMS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

9 Files
Filed

Jul 16, 2018

Status

CLOSED

County

Citrus County, FL

Judge

Hon. THOMAS, PATRICIA V Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for THOMAS, PATRICIA V

5 Files
Filed

Aug 18, 2016

Type

CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. JIROTKA, GEORGE M Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for JIROTKA, GEORGE M

9 Files
Filed

Jun 19, 2020

Type

CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. ALLAN, LINDA R Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for ALLAN, LINDA R

1 File
Filed

Dec 10, 2018

County

Polk County, FL

Judge

Hon. 11 WAYNE DURDEN Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for 11 WAYNE DURDEN

8 Files
Filed

Aug 23, 2021

Status

CLOSED

County

Charlotte County, FL

Judge

Hon. GENTILE, GEOFFREY H

15 Files
Filed

Jun 17, 2022

Type

INSURANCE CLAIMS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. WILLIAMS, AMY M Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for WILLIAMS, AMY M

22 Files
Filed

Aug 30, 2018

Type

CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

Filed

Nov 24, 2020

Status

OPEN

Type

Matter Involving Claims more than $8000 but less than $15,000

County

Indian River County, FL

Judge

Hon. MENZ, NICOLE

4 Files
Filed

Sep 04, 2018

Status

Disposed

Type

Contract and Indebtedness

County

Collier County, FL

Judge

Hon. Brodie, Lauren L Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Brodie, Lauren L

20 Files
Filed

Jun 21, 2019

Status

CLOSED

Type

Contract and Indebtedness

County

Lake County, FL

Judge

Hon. MOSLEY, DAN R Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MOSLEY, DAN R

Filed

Jun 03, 2021

Status

CLOSED

Judge

Hon. Anderson Jr, Bruce R

County

Duval County, FL

Court

Circuit Civil

1 File
Filed

Apr 29, 2021

Status

CLOSED

Judge

Hon. DEARING, KATIE L Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for DEARING, KATIE L

County

Duval County, FL

Court

Circuit Civil

2 Files
Filed

Jun 08, 2021

Status

CLOSED

County

Manatee County, FL

Judge

Hon. CHARLES SNIFFEN Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for CHARLES SNIFFEN

14 Files
Filed

Jan 10, 2019

Type

INSURANCE CLAIMS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MEYER, KEITH Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MEYER, KEITH

20 Files
Filed

Jul 08, 2019

Status

Disposed

Type

Contract and Indebtedness

County

Collier County, FL

Judge

Hon. Hayes, Hugh D Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Hayes, Hugh D

9 Files
Filed

May 03, 2019

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

6 Files
Filed

Apr 27, 2021

Status

OPEN

County

St. Johns County, FL

Judge

Hon. MALTZ, HOWARD M. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MALTZ, HOWARD M.

Filed

Apr 21, 2016

Type

INSURANCE CLAIMS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope