Cases for midland credit management, inc. in Pennsylvania

Filed

Apr 11, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Mar 21, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

May 17, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Mar 08, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

May 17, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Apr 04, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Mar 21, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Jan 31, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Apr 04, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

1 File
Filed

Apr 06, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

1 File
Filed

Aug 02, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Jan 31, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Jan 31, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Feb 07, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Feb 07, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Feb 01, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Jan 10, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Jan 14, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Dec 05, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Northampton County, PA

Filed

Jan 27, 2023

Status

OPEN

County

Northampton County, PA

Filed

Jan 23, 2023

Status

OPEN

County

Northampton County, PA

Filed

Feb 17, 2023

Status

OPEN

County

Northampton County, PA

Filed

Feb 21, 2023

Status

OPEN

County

Northampton County, PA

Filed

Feb 17, 2023

Status

OPEN

County

Northampton County, PA

Filed

Feb 21, 2023

Status

OPEN

County

Northampton County, PA

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope