Cases for lvnv funding llc, c o patenaude felix, a.p.c. in Pennsylvania

Filed

Feb 16, 2021

Status

Active

County

Schuylkill County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge James Reiley

Filed

Dec 05, 2019

Status

Closed

County

Beaver County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Dirk A. Goodwald

Filed

Oct 21, 2020

Status

Closed

County

Beaver County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Joseph Schafer

Filed

Nov 09, 2019

Status

Closed

County

Berks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Dean R. Patton

Filed

Feb 22, 2021

Status

Active

County

Westmoreland County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Cheryl J. Peck-Yakopec

Filed

Jul 06, 2021

Status

Active

County

Lycoming County, PA

Judge

Hon. Gary A Whiteman

Filed

Jul 06, 2021

Status

Active

County

Lycoming County, PA

Judge

Hon. Gary A Whiteman

Filed

Sep 25, 2020

Status

Closed

County

Beaver County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Alex Korol

Filed

Sep 01, 2020

Status

Closed

County

Pike County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Deborah Fischer

Filed

Mar 30, 2021

Status

Active

County

Lycoming County, PA

Judge

Hon. Gary A Whiteman

Filed

Jan 16, 2020

Status

Active

County

Lycoming County, PA

Judge

Hon. Gary A Whiteman

Filed

Sep 27, 2021

Status

Active

County

Chester County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Jeffrey J. Valocchi

Filed

Jan 31, 2020

Status

Closed

County

Beaver County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Eileen M. Conroy

Filed

May 12, 2021

Status

Active

County

Cambria County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Susan M. Gindlesperger

Filed

Sep 27, 2021

Status

Active

County

Cambria County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Susan M. Gindlesperger

Filed

Mar 14, 2022

Status

Active

County

Centre County, PA

Judge

Hon. The Honorable Kelley Gillette-Walker

Filed

May 22, 2023

Status

Active

County

Northampton County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Alicia Rose Zito

Filed

Nov 09, 2021

Status

Active

County

Luzerne County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Rick Cronauer

Filed

Mar 02, 2021

Status

Active

County

Luzerne County, PA

Judge

Hon. Alexandra Kokura Kravitz

Filed

Jan 08, 2021

Status

Active

County

Luzerne County, PA

Judge

Hon. Alexandra Kokura Kravitz

Filed

Jun 28, 2022

Status

Active

County

Indiana County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Susanne V. Steffee

Filed

Mar 01, 2022

Status

Active

County

Fayette County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Mike Defino Jr.

Filed

Sep 23, 2022

Status

Active

County

Jefferson County, PA

Judge

Hon. Gregory M Bazylak

Filed

Aug 17, 2022

Status

Active

County

York County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Richard T. Thomas

Filed

Apr 25, 2022

Status

Active

County

Somerset County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Susan Mankamyer

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope