Cases for lvnc funding llc in Pennsylvania

Filed

Oct 20, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Chester County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Jeffrey J. Valocchi

Filed

Apr 06, 2018

Status

Closed

County

Westmoreland County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Wayne P. Vlasic

Filed

Mar 11, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Beaver County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Joseph Schafer

Filed

Apr 15, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Northampton County, PA

Judge

Hon. Richard H. Yetter III

Filed

Jun 12, 2018

Status

Closed

County

Indiana County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Susanne V. Steffee

Filed

Aug 18, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Lackawanna County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Paul J. Ware

Filed

Oct 21, 2010

Status

Closed

County

Wayne County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Bonnie L. Carney

Filed

Apr 28, 2022

Status

Active

County

York County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Jeffrey A. Sneeringer

Filed

Aug 15, 2022

Status

Active

County

Monroe County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Kristina Anzini

Filed

Mar 08, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Perry County, PA

Judge

Hon. Nicholas S. Lippincott

Filed

Nov 21, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Beaver County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Dale F. Nicholson

Filed

Mar 25, 2022

Status

Active

County

Bucks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Terrence Hughes

Filed

Jul 12, 2022

Status

Active

County

Berks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Sandra L. Fegley

Filed

Oct 20, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Beaver County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Eileen M. Conroy

Filed

Aug 08, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Beaver County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Joseph Schafer

Filed

Nov 09, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Elk County, PA

Judge

Hon. Mark S. Jacob

Filed

Feb 28, 2022

Status

Active

County

Northampton County, PA

Judge

Hon. Jordan A. Knisley

Filed

Mar 22, 2018

Status

Closed

County

Erie County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Suzanne C. Mack

Filed

Mar 05, 2018

Status

Closed

County

York County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge John H. Fishel

Filed

Dec 14, 2017

Status

Closed

County

Lackawanna County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Alyce Hailstone Farrell

Filed

Mar 09, 2018

Status

Closed

County

Lackawanna County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Alyce Hailstone Farrell

Filed

Oct 27, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Northampton County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Patricia C. Broscius

Filed

Dec 15, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Clarion County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Jeffrey C. Miller

Filed

Oct 20, 2010

Status

Closed

County

Elk County, PA

Judge

Hon. Mark S. Jacob

Filed

Feb 21, 2011

Status

Closed

County

Cambria County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge John Prebish Jr.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope