Cases for lnvn funding llc in Pennsylvania

Filed

May 18, 2018

Status

Closed

County

Northampton County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Alicia Rose Zito

Filed

Nov 09, 2020

Status

Closed

County

Columbia County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Craig W. Long

Filed

Jun 29, 2022

Status

Active

County

Greene County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge David Curt Balint

Filed

Oct 03, 2022

Status

Active

County

Berks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Carissa L. Johnson

Filed

Sep 20, 2022

Status

Active

County

Wayne County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Bonnie L. Carney

Filed

Apr 16, 2022

Status

Active

County

Armstrong County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge James H. Owen

Filed

Oct 21, 2022

Status

Active

County

Berks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Carissa L. Johnson

Filed

Mar 07, 2023

Status

Active

County

Berks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Sandra L. Fegley

Filed

Mar 07, 2023

Status

Active

County

Berks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Sandra L. Fegley

Filed

Dec 05, 2022

Status

Active

County

Blair County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Benjamin F. Jones

Filed

Mar 27, 2023

Status

Active

County

Bucks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Corryn L. Kronnagel

Filed

Oct 24, 2022

Status

Active

County

Centre County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Casey M. McClain

Filed

Sep 01, 2022

Status

Active

County

Cumberland County, PA

Judge

Hon. The Honorable Kathryn H. Silcox

Filed

Mar 28, 2023

Status

Active

County

Cumberland County, PA

Judge

Hon. Elizabeth S. Beckley

Filed

Feb 13, 2023

Status

Active

County

Lehigh County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge David M. Howells Jr.

Filed

Feb 22, 2023

Status

Active

County

Wyoming County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge David K Plummer

Filed

Apr 24, 2023

Status

Active

County

York County, PA

Judge

Hon. Joel N. Toluba

Filed

May 02, 2022

Status

Active

County

Berks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Gail M. Greth

Filed

Sep 12, 2022

Status

Active

County

Berks County, PA

Judge

Hon. David L. Yoch

Filed

Jun 29, 2022

Status

Active

County

Beaver County, PA

Judge

Hon. Robert P. Dappenbrook

Filed

Apr 28, 2023

Status

Active

County

Bucks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Terrence Hughes

Filed

Jul 08, 2022

Status

Active

County

Cumberland County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Mark Martin

Filed

Dec 28, 2022

Status

Active

County

Dauphin County, PA

Judge

Hon. Michael J. Smith

Filed

Jul 08, 2022

Status

Active

County

Dauphin County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Hanif L. Johnson Sr.

Filed

Oct 05, 2022

Status

Active

County

Wayne County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Bonnie L. Carney

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope