Cases for lavrar flynn in Georgia

Filed

Nov 28, 2011

County

Catoosa County, GA

Judge

Hon. RALPH VAN PELT

Filed

Nov 28, 2011

County

Catoosa County, GA

Judge

Hon. RALPH VAN PELT

Filed

Mar 05, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Jan 20, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Filed

Jan 26, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge MGARRETT

Filed

Jan 11, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge MSPENCER

Filed

Apr 07, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Jan 20, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Filed

Feb 09, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge MSPENCER

Filed

Apr 07, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge MSPENCER

Filed

Jan 06, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge MSPENCER

Filed

Apr 14, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Sep 25, 2020

County

Dougherty County, GA

Judge

Hon. JOHN M. STEPHENSON Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for JOHN M. STEPHENSON

Filed

Jan 11, 2021

Status

Disposed, 06/23/2021

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Jan 12, 2021

Status

Disposed, 06/23/2021

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge MGARRETT

Filed

Sep 25, 2020

County

Dougherty County, GA

Judge

Hon. JOHN M. STEPHENSON Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for JOHN M. STEPHENSON

Filed

Feb 18, 2021

Status

Disposed, 04/26/2021

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Filed

Feb 18, 2021

Status

Disposed, 04/29/2021

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Mar 25, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Jan 29, 2021

Status

Disposed, 08/12/2021

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Filed

Mar 04, 2021

Status

Disposed, 04/26/2021

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Filed

Jun 14, 2021

County

Dougherty County, GA

Judge

Hon. JOHN M. STEPHENSON Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for JOHN M. STEPHENSON

Filed

Mar 25, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Filed

Oct 05, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Filed

Mar 05, 2021

Status

Disposed, 08/19/2021

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope