Cases for johnson, shane in Florida

47 Files
Filed

Oct 09, 2013

Type

SMALL CLAIMS 4 - $2,501 - $5,000

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. CARASSAS, JOHN Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for CARASSAS, JOHN

Filed

Sep 16, 2009

Status

Closed

Type

Other

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Cook, J.. Martha Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Cook, J.. Martha

11 Files
Filed

Oct 24, 2017

Status

CLOSED

County

St. Johns County, FL

Judge

Hon. TRAYNOR, J

6 Files
Filed

Jul 22, 2009

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. DIVISION A, CIRCUIT

38 Files
Filed

Feb 08, 2022

Type

NEGLIGENCE - PREMISES LIABILITY - COMMERCIAL

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. NEWTON, CYNTHIA J Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

10 Files
Filed

Apr 04, 2006

Status

Closed

Type

OTHER NEGLIGENCE

County

Palm Beach County, FL

Filed

Oct 16, 2009

Status

CLOSED

Type

INJUNCTION - REPEAT VIOLENCE

County

Indian River County, FL

Judge

Hon. COX, CYNTHIA L Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for COX, CYNTHIA L

Filed

May 08, 2007

Status

CLOSED

County

Martin County, FL

Judge

Hon. MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

Filed

Jan 08, 2010

Status

CLOS

Type

CHANGE OF NAME 2010

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. FAMILY 1

Filed

Jul 06, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

St. Johns County, FL

Judge

Hon. MALTZ, HOWARD M. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MALTZ, HOWARD M.

Filed

May 16, 2011

Status

CLOSED

County

St. Johns County, FL

Judge

Hon. TINLIN, CHARLES

3 Files
Filed

Aug 01, 2017

Status

Closed

Type

Contract & Indebtedness

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Rice, G. Elizabeth Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Rice, G. Elizabeth

7 Files
Filed

Sep 15, 2017

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Elizabeth G. Rice Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Elizabeth G. Rice

4 Files
Filed

Mar 24, 2010

Status

CLOS

Type

CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS - CIRCUIT 2010

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. DIVISION C, CIRCUIT

Filed

Feb 16, 2023

Status

OPEN

County

Baker County, FL

Judge

Hon. BREWER, SEAN DAVID

Filed

Jul 07, 2006

Status

Disposed

Type

Habeas Corpus (Criminal)

Judge

Hon. Perlman, Sandra Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Perlman, Sandra

County

Broward County, FL

Court

Central Courthouse

Filed

Oct 11, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Martin County, FL

30 Files
Filed

Jul 09, 2010

Status

Closed

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE

County

Palm Beach County, FL

Filed

Oct 23, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Martin County, FL

Judge

Hon. BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

1 File
Filed

Mar 29, 2017

Status

CLOSED

County

St. Johns County, FL

Judge

Hon. PYCRAFT, THOMAS

Status

OPEN

County

Marion County, FL

Judge

Hon. CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA

Filed

Oct 11, 2007

Status

Closed

Type

UIFSA INITIATING

County

Palm Beach County, FL

Filed

Feb 23, 2018

Status

CLOSED

Type

DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

County

St. Lucie County, FL

Judge

Hon. MCCANN, JAMES W Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MCCANN, JAMES W

Filed

Mar 18, 2020

Status

CLOSED

Type

SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION

County

Escambia County, FL

Judge

Hon. CLARK, LACEY POWELL

Filed

Sep 24, 2010

Status

CLOSED

Type

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE NIVD

County

St. Lucie County, FL

Judge

Hon. SCHWAB, CHARLES A

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope