Cases for holman, james in Florida

Filed

Feb 20, 2007

Status

CLOS

Type

WILL

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. No Judge Assigned

Filed

Dec 19, 2006

Status

CLOSED

County

Martin County, FL

Judge

Hon. BELANGER, ROBERT E

Filed

Apr 04, 2022

Status

ORIGINAL PENDING

Type

PROBATE

County

Brevard County, FL

Judge

Hon. MORGAN LAUR REINMAN Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MORGAN LAUR REINMAN

Filed

Jun 05, 2010

Status

Closed

Type

CHILD SUPPORT IV-D

County

Palm Beach County, FL

Filed

Sep 10, 2009

Status

Closed

Type

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

County

Palm Beach County, FL

4 Files
Filed

May 30, 2013

Status

Closed

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE

County

Palm Beach County, FL

3 Files
Filed

Jul 31, 2019

Status

ORIGINAL DISPOSED

Type

AUTO NEGLIGENCE

County

Brevard County, FL

Judge

Hon. PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T

10 Files
Filed

Feb 16, 2023

Status

OPEN

County

Baker County, FL

Judge

Hon. CASON, JODI Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for CASON, JODI

25 Files
Filed

Sep 24, 2019

Status

CLOSED

County

Bay County, FL

Judge

Hon. SMILEY, ELIJAH Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for SMILEY, ELIJAH

Filed

Dec 19, 2013

Status

CLOS

Type

ADMIT FOREIGN WILL TO RECORD

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. ECONOMOU, DENO

Filed

Sep 25, 2008

Status

CLOSED CASE

Type

RP/MF-NONHOMESTEAD RESD $250,000-MORE

County

Walton County, FL

Filed

Mar 21, 2006

Status

CLOSED

Type

MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

County

Osceola County, FL

Judge

Hon. KEST, JOHN MARSHALL

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope