Cases for garbus, mark a in New York

4 Files
Filed

Sep 17, 2013

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Consumer Credit Transaction

County

Kings County, NY

Court

Kings County Supreme Court

3 Files
Filed

Apr 05, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

5 Files
Filed

Mar 30, 2023

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

5 Files
Filed

Mar 08, 2023

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

5 Files
Filed

Mar 08, 2023

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Apr 04, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

3 Files
Filed

May 06, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Mar 24, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Dec 12, 2019

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Other Matters - Contract - Other

County

Ontario County, NY

Court

Ontario County Supreme Court

3 Files
Filed

Nov 14, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Nassau County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Nov 14, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Nassau County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Apr 22, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Nassau County, NY

3 Files
Filed

May 05, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

5 Files
Filed

Mar 09, 2023

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

5 Files
Filed

Mar 22, 2023

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Nov 14, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Nassau County, NY

6 Files
Filed

Feb 02, 2023

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

5 Files
Filed

Mar 28, 2023

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

5 Files
Filed

Mar 08, 2023

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Suffolk County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Apr 26, 2019

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff

County

St. Lawrence County, NY

Court

St. Lawrence County Supreme Court

2 Files
Filed

Dec 30, 2019

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff

County

St. Lawrence County, NY

Court

St. Lawrence County Supreme Court

4 Files
Filed

Nov 14, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Nassau County, NY

9 Files
Filed

Apr 05, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Nassau County, NY

9 Files
Filed

Mar 31, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Nassau County, NY

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope