Cases for discover bank in New York

2 Files
Filed

Mar 01, 2018

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

County

Chautauqua County, NY

Court

Chautauqua County Supreme Court

4 Files
Filed

Jan 14, 2014

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Queens County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Dec 11, 2013

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Foreclosure (residential mortgage)

County

Suffolk County, NY

Court

Suffolk County Supreme Court

6 Files
Filed

Apr 21, 2016

Status

Disposed

County

Westchester County, NY

Judge

Hon. Lewis Jay Lubell Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lewis Jay Lubell

1 File
Filed

Feb 05, 2015

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Consumer Credit (Card) Transaction Original Creditor Plaintiff

County

Erie County, NY

Court

Erie County Supreme Court

2 Files
Filed

Dec 16, 2019

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff

County

Monroe County, NY

Court

Monroe County Supreme Court

5 Files
Filed

May 19, 2017

Status

Disposed

Type

Real Property - Other (Quiet Title-Strict FC)

Judge

Hon. Robert H Freehill Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Robert H Freehill

County

Orange County, NY

Court

Orange County Supreme Court

1 File
Filed

Nov 11, 2014

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Consumer Credit (Card) Transaction Original Creditor Plaintiff

County

Rockland County, NY

Court

Rockland County Supreme Court

6 Files
Filed

Jul 29, 2019

Status

Disposed

Type

Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential

Judge

Hon. Maria G Rosa Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Maria G Rosa

County

Dutchess County, NY

Court

Dutchess County Supreme Court

15 Files
Filed

Dec 02, 2019

Status

Disposed

Type

Commercial - UCC

Judge

Hon. Mark M. Meddaugh Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Mark M. Meddaugh

County

Sullivan County, NY

Court

Sullivan County Supreme Court

2 Files
Filed

Nov 02, 2020

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Rockland County, NY

6 Files
Filed

Feb 24, 2015

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Foreclosure (residential mortgage)

County

Suffolk County, NY

Court

Suffolk County Supreme Court

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope