Cases for crown asset management, llc in Pennsylvania

Filed

Mar 31, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

1 File
Filed

Apr 07, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

1 File
Filed

Mar 31, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

1 File
Filed

May 17, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Jan 24, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Feb 17, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

1 File
Filed

Sep 28, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Filed

Jan 11, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Judge

Hon. THOMAS B. SPONAUGLE (Judge)

Filed

May 03, 2023

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Judge

Hon. LEONARD G BROWN, III (Judge)

Filed

Feb 11, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Lancaster County, PA

Judge

Hon. LEONARD G BROWN, III (Judge)

Filed

Sep 27, 2021

Status

Active

County

Venango County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Patrick E. Lowrey

Filed

Jan 18, 2023

Status

Active

County

Warren County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Laura S. Bauer

Filed

Jan 28, 2022

Status

Active

County

Schuylkill County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Anthony J. Kilker

Filed

Jun 08, 2018

Status

Closed

County

Blair County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Benjamin F. Jones

Filed

Mar 20, 2023

Status

Active

County

Luzerne County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Daniel O'Donnell

Filed

Dec 08, 2022

Status

Active

County

Franklin County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Kristin D. Nicklas

Filed

Dec 27, 2019

Status

Closed

County

Cambria County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Mary Ann Zanghi

Filed

Aug 13, 2021

Status

Active

County

Schuylkill County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Anthony J. Kilker

Filed

Feb 26, 2018

Status

Closed

County

Blair County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Matthew Dunio

Filed

Feb 28, 2018

Status

Inactive

County

Huntingdon County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Lisa Marie Covert

Filed

Jan 28, 2021

Status

Active

County

Lehigh County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Michael D'Amore

Filed

Dec 09, 2020

Status

Closed

County

Berks County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Tonya A. Butler

Filed

Jul 08, 2019

Status

Inactive

County

Lancaster County, PA

Judge

Hon. Edward A. Tobin

Filed

Aug 01, 2019

Status

Closed

County

Schuylkill County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Anthony J. Kilker

Filed

Aug 07, 2018

Status

Closed

County

Schuylkill County, PA

Judge

Hon. Magisterial District Judge Anthony J. Kilker

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope