Cases for buckle madge in Georgia

Filed

Feb 01, 2022

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge MGARRETT

Filed

Dec 27, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge MGARRETT

Filed

Oct 18, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Jul 11, 2022

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Filed

Dec 27, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Jun 23, 2022

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Dec 27, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge MGARRETT

Filed

Sep 22, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Filed

Jun 18, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Filed

Nov 30, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Filed

Aug 05, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Mar 17, 2022

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Filed

Aug 26, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Filed

Aug 02, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Filed

Nov 08, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Filed

Sep 22, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Dec 03, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Filed

Feb 22, 2022

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Filed

Mar 28, 2022

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

May 27, 2022

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Feb 15, 2022

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge T. HAYWARD

Filed

Aug 06, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Filed

Aug 26, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Filed

Feb 28, 2022

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge JPARKER

Filed

Sep 27, 2021

Status

Pending

County

Clayton County, GA

Judge

Hon. Judge COWEN

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope