Cases for apex roofing and restoration, llc in Florida

Filed

Oct 22, 2020

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Dec 24, 2019

County

Volusia County, FL

6 Files
Filed

Apr 09, 2020

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Nov 26, 2019

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Dec 22, 2022

Status

OPEN

Type

CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Jun 28, 2022

Status

CLOSED

Judge

Hon. DEARING, KATIE L Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for DEARING, KATIE L

County

Duval County, FL

Court

Circuit Civil

25 Files
Filed

Dec 07, 2020

County

Marion County, FL

Judge

Hon. Gary L. Sanders Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Gary L. Sanders

Filed

May 07, 2020

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Feb 13, 2019

County

Volusia County, FL

1 File
Filed

Feb 22, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Jun 22, 2021

County

Okaloosa County, FL

Judge

Hon. John Jay Gontarek Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for John Jay Gontarek

Filed

Oct 26, 2022

County

Okaloosa County, FL

Judge

Hon. Terrance R. Ketchel Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Terrance R. Ketchel

9 Files
Filed

Apr 15, 2020

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Apr 15, 2020

Status

OPEN

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

57 Files
Filed

Jun 30, 2021

Status

Open

Type

Contract & Indebtedness

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Polo, Melissa. M.

35 Files
Filed

Aug 23, 2022

Status

OPEN

County

Charlotte County, FL

Judge

Hon. BURNS, JOHN L Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for BURNS, JOHN L

7 Files
Filed

Dec 07, 2022

Status

OPEN

Type

BREACH OF CONTRACT

County

St. Lucie County, FL

Judge

Hon. BUCHANAN, LAURIE

Filed

Jul 15, 2021

Status

OPEN

County

Okaloosa County, FL

Judge

Hon. GONTAREK, JOHN Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for GONTAREK, JOHN

1 File
Filed

Jul 02, 2020

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

10 Files
Filed

Feb 15, 2022

Status

CLOSED

County

Seminole County, FL

Judge

Hon. SUSAN STACY Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for SUSAN STACY

8 Files
Filed

Dec 07, 2022

Status

OPEN

Type

BREACH OF CONTRACT

County

St. Lucie County, FL

Judge

Hon. BUCHANAN, LAURIE

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope