Cases for Yolo Federal Credi, T Union in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Yolo Federal Credi, T Union"

Filed

Oct 20, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Sep 13, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Apr 21, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Oct 23, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Oct 20, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Oct 24, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Apr 21, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Oct 20, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Oct 23, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Oct 20, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Nov 15, 1989

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Apr 26, 2002

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judge, Assigned

Filed

Oct 30, 1989

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Mar 17, 1988

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Dec 04, 1990

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Mar 17, 1988

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Mar 01, 1999

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judge, Assigned

Filed

May 29, 1990

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Nov 15, 1989

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

May 29, 1990

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Apr 11, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Apr 21, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Sep 13, 2006

Status

Active

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Sep 13, 2006

Status

Closed

County

Yolo County, CA

Filed

Apr 21, 2006

Status

Active

County

Yolo County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope