Cases for William Noriega in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "William Noriega"

Filed

Sep 19, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Mar 15, 2013

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Mar 02, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Dec 22, 2009

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Sep 12, 2008

Status

Close of ReOpen

Type

Breach of Contract

County

Hillsborough County, FL

Judge

Hon. Sabella, C. Christopher

Filed

Nov 25, 2008

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Feb 18, 2013

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

3 Files
Filed

Jun 26, 2013

Status

Closed

Type

NON HR FORECLOSURE > $50K, < $250K

County

Palm Beach County, FL

Filed

Dec 03, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Nov 27, 2012

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Jun 28, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Sep 12, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Dec 18, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

New Smyrna Beach Annex

Filed

Feb 16, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Sep 12, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Nov 19, 2013

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Aug 14, 2012

County

Volusia County, FL

3 Files
Filed

Jul 24, 2014

Status

Closed

Type

HR FORECLOSURE > $50K, < $250K

County

Palm Beach County, FL

Filed

Mar 15, 2013

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

Filed

Oct 12, 2012

County

Volusia County, FL

1 File
Filed

Jul 13, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

Filed

Sep 17, 2012

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

New Smyrna Beach Annex

Filed

Oct 24, 2011

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

4 Files
Filed

Oct 17, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Type

14H - HOMESTEAD/RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE

County

Seminole County, FL

Judge

Hon. DEBRA S. NELSON

7 Files
Filed

Dec 04, 2009

Status

Reclosed Case

Type

*Real Property MTG Foreclosure + (prior to 1/1/10)

Judge

Hon. 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

County

Broward County, FL

Court

Central Courthouse

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope