Cases for Wecker, Esq., Ross C in Massachusetts

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Wecker, Esq., Ross C"

19 Files
Filed

Feb 23, 2018

Status

04/16/2021

Type

Construction Dispute

County

Berkshire County, MA

Judge

Hon. Agostini, John A

6 Files
Filed

Nov 05, 2019

County

Berkshire County, MA

Judge

Hon. Agostini, John

19 Files
Filed

Nov 30, 2020

Status

11/30/2020

Type

Construction Dispute

County

Essex County, MA

15 Files
Filed

Jun 01, 2020

Status

06/01/2020

Type

Services, Labor and Materials

County

Middlesex County, MA

45 Files
Filed

Jul 11, 2018

Status

07/11/2018

Type

Other Contract Action

County

Norfolk County, MA

Judge

Hon. Miller, Rosalind H

4 Files
Filed

Mar 25, 2016

Status

03/25/2016

Type

Construction Dispute

County

Middlesex County, MA

1 File
Filed

Mar 20, 2015

Status

04/11/2016

Type

Services, Labor and Materials

County

Middlesex County, MA

Filed

May 07, 2012

Status

05/07/2012

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Middlesex County, MA

15 Files
Filed

Jan 23, 2017

Status

01/23/2017

Type

Services, Labor and Materials

County

Middlesex County, MA

Judge

Hon. Henry, Bruce R

42 Files
Filed

Sep 22, 2016

Status

09/22/2016

Type

Goods Sold and Delivered

County

Middlesex County, MA

Judge

Hon. Freniere, Diane

3 Files
Filed

Jun 01, 2012

Status

06/01/2012

Type

Certiorari Action, G. L. c. 249 § 4

County

Middlesex County, MA

Judge

Hon. Karp, Jeffrey

22 Files
Filed

Jun 22, 2018

Status

06/22/2018

Type

Other Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Norfolk County, MA

Judge

Hon. Connolly, Rosemary

33 Files
Filed

Aug 24, 2017

Status

08/24/2017

Type

Construction Dispute

County

Norfolk County, MA

Judge

Hon. Gildea, Mark

Filed

Jul 09, 2009

Status

07/21/2010

Type

Other Real Property Action

County

Suffolk County, MA

3 Files
Filed

May 20, 2021

Status

05/20/2021

Type

Motor Vehicle Negligence - Personal Injury / Property Damage

County

Worcester County, MA

5 Files
Filed

Jul 08, 2021

Status

07/08/2021

Type

Services, Labor and Materials

County

Suffolk County, MA

Judge

Hon. Buckley, Elaine M

19 Files
Filed

Oct 29, 2018

Status

10/29/2018

Type

Construction Dispute

County

Middlesex County, MA

3 Files
Filed

Feb 07, 2022

Status

02/07/2022

Type

Services, Labor and Materials

County

Worcester County, MA

3 Files
Filed

Nov 03, 2020

Status

03/26/2021

Type

Services, Labor and Materials

County

Suffolk County, MA

3 Files
Filed

Apr 05, 2021

Status

04/05/2021

Type

Construction Dispute

County

Worcester County, MA

6 Files
Filed

Apr 08, 2022

Status

04/08/2022

Type

Injunction

County

Suffolk County, MA

3 Files
Filed

Dec 23, 2021

Status

12/23/2021

Type

Services, Labor and Materials

County

Suffolk County, MA

Filed

Jun 27, 2013

Status

06/27/2013

Type

Goods Sold and Delivered

County

Bristol County, MA

1 File
Filed

Feb 16, 2018

Status

03/14/2018

Type

Other Equity Action

County

Berkshire County, MA

Judge

Hon. Agostini, John A

5 Files
Filed

Feb 09, 2022

Status

02/09/2022

Type

Construction Dispute

County

Worcester County, MA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope