Cases for W Russell Fields in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets
1 File
Filed

Sep 02, 2020

Status

Open

County

Stanislaus County, CA

Judge

Hon. Sandhu, Sonny S. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Sandhu, Sonny S.

Filed

Nov 06, 2000

Status

Dismissed

County

Kern County, CA

Judge

Hon. Chapin, Sidney P. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Chapin, Sidney P.

1 File
Filed

Feb 08, 2021

Status

Opened

County

Yolo County, CA

Judge

Hon. McAdam, Samuel T. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for McAdam, Samuel T.

Filed

Sep 01, 2015

Status

Conditional Settlement

Type

Unlimited Civil Professional Negligence

Judge

Hon. Ross, Roger Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Ross, Roger

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Mar 20, 2015

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jan 25, 2012

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. David W. Abbott Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for David W. Abbott

Filed

Sep 14, 2010

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judy Holzer Hersher Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Judy Holzer Hersher

Filed

Jun 23, 2009

Type

Other Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Apr 03, 2002

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jan 25, 2006

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Feb 08, 2018

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Mar 20, 2009

Type

Other Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. David W. Abbott Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for David W. Abbott

Filed

Sep 30, 2010

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. Robert C. Hight Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Robert C. Hight

Filed

Mar 06, 2018

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Oct 29, 2009

Type

Other Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judy Holzer Hersher Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Judy Holzer Hersher

Filed

Jun 01, 2015

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. Gerrit W. Wood Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Gerrit W. Wood

Filed

Jun 23, 2009

Type

Other Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. Robert C. Hight Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Robert C. Hight

Filed

Dec 07, 2011

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. Gerrit W. Wood Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Gerrit W. Wood

Filed

Jan 31, 2008

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. Brian R. Van Camp Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Brian R. Van Camp

Filed

Nov 25, 2008

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. Alan G. Perkins Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Alan G. Perkins

Filed

Jun 23, 2010

Type

PI/PD/WD - Auto

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. Gerrit W. Wood Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Gerrit W. Wood

Filed

Apr 30, 2013

Status

Disposed

Type

Unlimited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. Lofthus, Linda L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lofthus, Linda L.

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

May 29, 2008

Type

Other Collections

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. David W. Abbott Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for David W. Abbott

Filed

Jan 31, 2008

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

County

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

Hon. Brian R. Van Camp Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Brian R. Van Camp

Filed

Apr 04, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Auto Tort

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +