Cases for Unknown Beneficiaries in Florida

12 Files
Filed

Jul 21, 2017

Type

REAL PROPERTY OTHER1 - $0 - $50,000

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM

Filed

May 20, 2016

Type

REAL PROP - HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE1 $0 - $50,000

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. BOYER, BRUCE Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for BOYER, BRUCE

Filed

Jun 29, 2016

Type

REAL PROP - NON-HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE1 $0 - $50,000

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MEYER, KEITH Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MEYER, KEITH

Filed

Jan 31, 2013

Type

REAL PROP - NON-HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE2 $50,001-$249,999

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. SHAMES, MARK I

Filed

Dec 11, 2014

County

Volusia County, FL

32 Files
Filed

Jul 28, 2017

Type

REAL PROP - HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE2 $50,001 - $249,999

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. MINKOFF, THOMAS H Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MINKOFF, THOMAS H

22 Files
Filed

Nov 09, 2016

Status

Disposed

Type

Other Circuit Civil

County

Collier County, FL

Judge

Hon. Hayes, Hugh D Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Hayes, Hugh D

Filed

Jan 08, 2020

County

Volusia County, FL

Filed

Nov 11, 2014

Type

REAL PROP - NON-HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE2 $50,001-$249,999

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. BOYER, BRUCE Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for BOYER, BRUCE

Filed

Jan 14, 2016

Status

CLOSED

Type

Injunction

County

Charlotte County, FL

Judge

Hon. PORTER, LISA S Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for PORTER, LISA S

34 Files
Filed

Oct 05, 2010

Status

Disposed

Type

Non-Homestead Foreclosure $250,000 or more

County

Collier County, FL

Judge

Hon. Brodie, Lauren L Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Brodie, Lauren L

2 Files
Filed

Nov 12, 2009

Status

Disposed

Type

Real Property Mortgage Foreclosure

County

Collier County, FL

Judge

Hon. Hayes, Hugh D Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Hayes, Hugh D

Filed

Feb 26, 2013

Type

REAL PROP - HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE2 $50,001 - $249,999

County

Pinellas County, FL

27 Files
Filed

Jul 11, 2019

Type

REAL PROP - HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE2 $50,001 - $249,999

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. COVERT, THANE Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for COVERT, THANE

15 Files
Filed

Mar 03, 2017

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

18 Files
Filed

Nov 04, 2019

Type

REAL PROPERTY OTHER1 - $0 - $50,000

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. JIROTKA, GEORGE M Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for JIROTKA, GEORGE M

Filed

May 09, 2019

Status

CLOSED

Judge

Hon. WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.

County

Duval County, FL

Court

Circuit Civil

Filed

Apr 02, 2008

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

City Island Courthouse

4 Files
Filed

Dec 03, 2007

Status

Disposed

Type

CA Mortgage Foreclosure

County

Lee County, FL

3 Files
Filed

Apr 16, 2008

Status

Disposed

Type

CA Mortgage Foreclosure

County

Lee County, FL

13 Files
Filed

Aug 10, 2005

Status

CLOS

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. DIVISION C, CIRCUIT

42 Files
Filed

Dec 11, 2019

Type

REAL PROP - NON-HOMESTEAD RES FORECLOSURE2 $50,001-$249,999

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. JIROTKA, GEORGE M Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for JIROTKA, GEORGE M

13 Files
Filed

Jun 18, 2020

Status

CLOS

Type

REAL PROPERTY $0-$50,000 2010

County

Sarasota County, FL

Judge

Hon. MCHUGH, ANDREA Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for MCHUGH, ANDREA

1 File
Filed

Jun 04, 2012

Status

CLOSED

Judge

Hon. FORECLOSURE JUDGE,

County

Duval County, FL

Court

Circuit Civil

4 Files
Filed

Dec 11, 2017

Status

CLOSED

County

Volusia County, FL

Court

DeLand

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +