Cases for U.S.A. HOME DEPOT in California

Filed

Aug 13, 2014

Status

Dism Lack Prosecutn per 581a & 583 02/16/2016

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Benny C. Osorio Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Benny C. Osorio

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Oct 08, 2003

Status

Jury Verdict 07/29/2005

Type

Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Cesar C. Sarmiento Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Cesar C. Sarmiento

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Santa Monica Courthouse

Filed

Nov 08, 2004

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 07/07/2005

Type

Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jan 29, 2010

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 12/22/2010

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Louis M. Meisinger Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Louis M. Meisinger

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Van Nuys Courthouse East

Filed

Sep 03, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 03/10/2015

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Rita Miller Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Rita Miller

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Oct 25, 2007

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 06/19/2008

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Michael B. Harwin Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Michael B. Harwin

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Van Nuys Courthouse East

Filed

Feb 27, 2012

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 10/22/2012

Type

Product Liability (not asbestos or toxic/environmental) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Burbank Courthouse

Filed

Jul 02, 2014

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 04/05/2016

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. David Sotelo Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for David Sotelo

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jan 23, 2008

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 08/11/2008

Type

Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Kevin C. Brazile Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Kevin C. Brazile

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Aug 17, 2007

Status

Legacy Judgment 10/02/2007

Type

Other Commercial/Business Tort (not fraud/ breach of contract) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Dec 18, 2003

Status

Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial 04/18/2005

Type

Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Lisa Hart Cole Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lisa Hart Cole

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Santa Monica Courthouse

Filed

Feb 06, 2007

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 02/14/2008

Type

Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jan 12, 2005

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 03/03/2009

Type

Product Liability (not asbestos or toxic/environmental) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. David L. Minning Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for David L. Minning

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

3 Files
Filed

Dec 18, 2017

Status

Pending

Type

Premises Liability (e.g.slip & fall) (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Yolanda Orozco Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Yolanda Orozco

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Sep 28, 2004

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 08/11/2005

Type

Asbestos- Personal Injury/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Unknown Judicial Officer

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +