Cases for Tropical Industrial Plastics Inc in Florida

trellis logo loading

1-5 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Tropical Industrial Plastics Inc"

Filed

Apr 26, 2011

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. JAGGER, EDWIN

Filed

Dec 18, 2009

Type

CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

Filed

Jan 19, 2010

Type

CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - COUNTY

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

Filed

Mar 04, 2009

Type

CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. SCHAEFER, JOHN A

Filed

Apr 29, 2005

Type

CONTRACTS AND INDEBTEDNESS - CIRCUIT

County

Pinellas County, FL

Judge

Hon. LENDERMAN, JOHN C

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope