Cases for Trevino, Armando in California

trellis logo loading

1-17 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Trevino, Armando"

Filed

Dec 15, 2014

Status

Statistical Disposition 02/01/2016

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Maren

Filed

Aug 09, 2000

Status

Closed
Court Location: San Bernardino
Judicial Officer:

Type

Quiet Title $10,000 or Less Limited

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Court

San Bernardino

Filed

Jul 31, 2008

Status

Judgment

County

Kern County, CA

Filed

Jun 20, 2016

Status

Statistical Disposition 07/11/2016

Type

DV Prevention w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Valerie L.

Filed

Nov 08, 2017

Status

Statistical Disposition 11/28/2017

Type

DV Prevention w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Valerie L.

Filed

Oct 12, 2017

Status

Statistical Disposition 11/02/2017

Type

DV Prevention w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Matthew A

Filed

May 13, 2019

Status

Statistical Disposition 12/16/2019

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Shelley

Filed

Jan 06, 2021

Status

Pending

Type

Small Claims (Limited Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Apr 09, 2018

Status

Judgment

County

Kern County, CA

Filed

Jan 07, 2011

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 07/26/2011

Type

Labor Commissioner Appeals (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

Filed

Jul 19, 2007

Status

Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) 08/08/2007

Type

Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Norwalk Courthouse

Filed

Jun 11, 2003

Status

Judgment Entered

County

San Bernardino County, CA

Filed

Feb 15, 2011

Status

Legacy Judgment 02/15/2011

Type

Admn Agncy Award(not unpaid taxes) (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Compton Courthouse

Filed

Mar 26, 2021

Status

Pending

Type

Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Feb 18, 2009

Status

Dismissed - Other 08/11/2009

Type

Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

Filed

Jul 18, 1995

Status

Dismissed - Other 10/29/1997

Type

Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Compton Courthouse

Filed

Mar 09, 2022

Status

Pending

Type

Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope