Cases for Tokarz, Matthew D in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Tokarz, Matthew D"

Filed

Mar 08, 2011

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Tracy Branch

Filed

Apr 15, 2010

Status

Closed

Type

Limited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential

Judge

Hon. Sparks, Sheryle

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Apr 27, 2011

Status

Disposed

Type

Limited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Lodi Branch

Filed

Feb 25, 2011

Status

Closed

Type

Limited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Lodi Branch

Filed

Jul 23, 2008

Status

Closed

Type

Limited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential

Judge

Hon. Sparks, Sheryle

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Jul 17, 2008

Status

Closed

Type

Limited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential

Judge

Hon. Sparks, Sheryle

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Jun 09, 2008

Status

Closed

Type

Limited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential

Judge

Hon. Sparks, Sheryle

County

San Joaquin County, CA

Court

Stockton

Filed

Apr 29, 2008

Type

PI/PD/WD - Other

County

Sacramento County, CA

Filed

Jul 10, 2008

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Aug 26, 2008

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Oct 27, 2008

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Aug 29, 2008

Status

Dismissed

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Jun 09, 2008

Status

Judgment

County

Fresno County, CA

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE

Filed

Jun 05, 2008

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Jun 30, 2008

Status

Dismissed

County

Ventura County, CA

Filed

Jul 10, 2008

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Jul 22, 2008

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Feb 17, 2011

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Jun 26, 2008

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Sep 26, 2008

Status

Judgment

County

Kern County, CA

Filed

Jun 10, 2010

Status

Dismissed

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Aug 29, 2008

Status

Judgment

County

Santa Barbara County, CA

Filed

Jun 12, 2008

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Unlawful Detainer - Residential

County

San Diego County, CA

40 Files
Filed

Jun 11, 2020

Status

Active

County

San Mateo County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope