Cases for Sysco San Francisco, Inc. in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Sysco San Francisco, Inc."

4 Files
Filed

Aug 06, 2012

Status

Active

County

San Mateo County, CA

6 Files
Filed

Mar 23, 2012

Status

Dismissed

County

San Mateo County, CA

Judge

Hon. Grandsaert, John L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Grandsaert, John L.

Filed

Jan 21, 2010

Status

DISMISSED - CASE DISMISSED

Type

MV - Compl.for Motor Vehicle

County

Solano County, CA

Judge

Hon. BEEMAN, PAUL L. Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for BEEMAN, PAUL L.

3 Files
Filed

Jan 20, 2015

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

19 Files
Filed

May 22, 2014

Status

Closed

County

San Mateo County, CA

5 Files
Filed

Jan 17, 2014

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

5 Files
Filed

Jul 09, 2012

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

4 Files
Filed

Jul 23, 2013

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

21 Files
Filed

Apr 02, 2020

Type

CONTRACT/WARRANTY

County

San Francisco County, CA

5 Files
Filed

Apr 23, 2012

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

3 Files
Filed

Jun 01, 2017

Type

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)

County

San Francisco County, CA

4 Files
Filed

Jun 01, 2017

Type

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)

County

San Francisco County, CA

6 Files
Filed

Jul 09, 2012

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

3 Files
Filed

Jan 17, 2014

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File
Filed

May 06, 2013

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

Filed

Jul 27, 2017

Status

DISMISSED 12/19/2018

County

Contra Costa County, CA

Judge

Hon. Judith S. Craddick Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Judith S. Craddick

1 File
Filed

Apr 02, 2013

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

5 Files
Filed

Aug 14, 2012

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

2 Files
Filed

Aug 08, 2012

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File
Filed

Oct 25, 2013

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

4 Files
Filed

Jul 26, 2017

Type

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)

County

San Francisco County, CA

3 Files
Filed

Jul 26, 2017

Type

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File
Filed

Jul 01, 2016

Type

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)

County

San Francisco County, CA

1 File
Filed

May 07, 2014

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

6 Files
Filed

Apr 17, 2012

Type

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS

County

San Francisco County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope