Cases for Sok, Curtis B in California

1 File
Filed

Feb 02, 2015

Status

Dismissed

County

Fresno County, CA

Judge

Hon. Cabrera, Carlos Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Cabrera, Carlos

24 Files
Filed

Apr 24, 2020

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Slocum, Steven Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Slocum, Steven

7 Files
Filed

Apr 23, 2020

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Slocum, Steven Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Slocum, Steven

1 File
Filed

Apr 03, 2015

Status

Dismissed

County

Fresno County, CA

Judge

Hon. Gamoian, Lisa Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Gamoian, Lisa

4 Files
Filed

Jan 28, 2019

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Lo, Paul Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lo, Paul

4 Files
Filed

Apr 05, 2021

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Slocum, Steven Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Slocum, Steven

Filed

Apr 13, 2009

Status

Judgment

County

Fresno County, CA

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE

2 Files
Filed

Jul 27, 2020

Status

Active

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Lo, Paul Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lo, Paul

38 Files
Filed

Jul 11, 2017

Status

Active

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Ash, Carol Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Ash, Carol

5 Files
Filed

Jun 09, 2021

Status

Active

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Lo, Paul Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lo, Paul

4 Files
Filed

Jun 04, 2021

Status

Active

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Slocum, Steven Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Slocum, Steven

2 Files
Filed

May 12, 2021

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Lo, Paul Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lo, Paul

5 Files
Filed

Jun 09, 2021

Status

Active

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Lo, Paul Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lo, Paul

3 Files
Filed

Sep 08, 2020

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. McCabe, Brian Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for McCabe, Brian

11 Files
Filed

Jun 08, 2021

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Hollman, James

Filed

Aug 17, 2009

Status

Judgment

County

Fresno County, CA

Judge

Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE

2 Files
Filed

May 26, 2021

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Slocum, Steven Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Slocum, Steven

2 Files
Filed

May 24, 2021

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Slocum, Steven Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Slocum, Steven

1 File
Filed

Jan 20, 2021

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Slocum, Steven Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Slocum, Steven

9 Files
Filed

Feb 10, 2021

Status

Active

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Hansen, Ronald Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Hansen, Ronald

9 Files
Filed

Jan 03, 2020

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Kirihara, John Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Kirihara, John

14 Files
Filed

Apr 11, 2019

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Hollman, James

15 Files
Filed

May 02, 2018

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Lo, Paul Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for Lo, Paul

23 Files
Filed

Oct 08, 2019

Status

Inactive

County

Merced County, CA

Judge

Hon. Mewhinney, Douglas V.

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +