Cases for Smith, Cheryl Ann in California

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
NY
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets
Filed

Aug 21, 2020

Status

Pending

Type

Petitions - Other

County

San Diego County, CA

Filed

Dec 05, 2008

Status

Statistical Disposition 01/28/2009

Type

Joint Petition for Summary Dissolution (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Judge

Hon. Marjorie S.

Filed

Oct 23, 2017

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Sep 08, 2017

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Sep 19, 2014

Status

ACTIVE

County

Contra Costa County, CA

Judge

Hon. John T. Laettner Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for John T. Laettner

Filed

Jan 21, 2009

Status

Statistical Disposition 05/08/2009

Type

Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Filed

Mar 06, 2018

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Jun 10, 2013

Status

ACTIVE

County

Contra Costa County, CA

Filed

Apr 25, 2007

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Judge

Hon. L. Thomas Surh Trellis Spinner 👉 Discover key insights by exploring more analytics for L. Thomas Surh

Filed

Oct 17, 2014

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Oct 19, 2010

Status

ACTIVE

County

Contra Costa County, CA

Filed

May 27, 2015

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Jun 30, 2016

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Feb 28, 2014

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Mar 29, 2017

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

May 11, 1995

Status

Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution on 10/08/1997

Type

Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)

Judge

Hon. Master Calendar

County

Los Angeles County, CA

Court

Santa Monica Courthouse

Filed

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Sep 16, 2016

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Jun 19, 2015

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

May 14, 1998

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Sep 15, 2014

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Apr 06, 2018

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

May 24, 2018

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Aug 17, 2016

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

Filed

Oct 20, 2000

Type

Civil

County

Alameda County, CA

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope
    To:
    and 0 +