Cases for Slamowitz, Mitchell G in New York

trellis logo loading

1-25 of results

We found
Loading...
CA
dockets,
Loading...
TX
dockets,
Loading...
FL
dockets

Get an alert with new cases related to: "Slamowitz, Mitchell G"

1 File
Filed

Dec 02, 2016

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction

County

Queens County, NY

Court

Queens County Supreme Court

2 Files
Filed

Feb 17, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Erie County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Jun 24, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Erie County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Oct 30, 2014

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Consumer Credit (Card) Transaction Original Creditor Plaintiff

County

Rockland County, NY

Court

Rockland County Supreme Court

1 File
Filed

Jan 18, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Rockland County, NY

1 File
Filed

Feb 22, 2012

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Commercial

County

Rockland County, NY

Court

Rockland County Supreme Court

10 Files
Filed

Nov 24, 2015

Status

Disposed

Type

Torts - Other (FDCPA)

County

Erie County, NY

Court

Erie County Supreme Court

16 Files
Filed

Sep 08, 2015

Status

Disposed

Type

Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

10 Files
Filed

Sep 11, 2015

Status

Disposed

Type

Tort

Judge

Hon. Catherine Nugent Panepint

County

Erie County, NY

Court

Erie County Supreme Court

1 File
Filed

Dec 13, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Rockland County, NY

6 Files
Filed

May 25, 2021

Status

Active

County

Erie County, NY

Judge

Hon. Ejeannette Ogden

Filed

Jan 31, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Rockland County, NY

1 File
Filed

Nov 17, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Rockland County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Feb 21, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Rockland County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Apr 15, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Otsego County, NY

5 Files
Filed

Dec 31, 2019

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff

County

Delaware County, NY

Court

Delaware County Supreme Court

2 Files
Filed

Jul 24, 2020

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Erie County, NY

1 File
Filed

Nov 17, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Rockland County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Feb 21, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Rockland County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Jul 12, 2018

Status

Pre-RJI

Type

Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff

County

Westchester County, NY

Court

Westchester County Supreme Court

1 File
Filed

Nov 18, 2013

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Westchester County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Apr 19, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Erie County, NY

2 Files
Filed

Apr 19, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Erie County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Jun 08, 2021

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Yates County, NY

3 Files
Filed

Jan 28, 2022

Status

Pre-RJI

County

Rockland County, NY

0
Selected
 

Please wait a moment while we load this page.

New Envelope